This case was last updated from PACER on 01/11/2019 at 07:21:53 (UTC).

McQuage v. Safety Products, Inc

Case Summary

On 11/12/2018 McQuage filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Safety Products, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sheryl H. Lipman and Charmiane G. Claxton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02781

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sheryl H. Lipman

Referral Judge

Charmiane G. Claxton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Kelly A. McQuage

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Safety Products, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Christopher Michael Williams

Attorney at BLACK MCLAREN JONES RYLAND & GRIFFEE, P.C.

530 Oak Court Dr., Ste. 360

Memphis, TN 38117

J. Mark Griffee

Attorney at BLACK MCLAREN JONES RYLAND & GRIFFEE, P.C.

530 Oak Court Dr., Ste. 360

Memphis, TN 38117

Jana Davis Lamanna

Attorney at BLACK MCLAREN JONES RYLAND & GRIFFEE, P.C.

530 Oak Court Dr., Ste. 360

Memphis, TN 38117

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Emma Redden Davis

Attorney at BAKER DONELSON BEARMAN COALDWELL & BERKOWITZ

165 Madison Ave., Suite 38103

Memphis, TN 38103

Angie C. Davis

Attorney at BAKER DONELSON BEARMAN CALDWELL & BERKOWITZ

First Tennessee Bank Building, 165 Madison Avenue, Suite 2000

Memphis, TN 38103

 

Court Documents

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Safety Products, Inc (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2922829), filed by Kelly A. McQuage. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Williams, Christopher) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

#2

(#2) Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jae) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Summons by Christopher Michael Williams on behalf of Kelly A. McQuage. (Williams, Christopher) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Safety Products, Inc. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by J. Mark Griffee on behalf of Kelly A. McQuage (Griffee, J.) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

#25

(#25) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Williams, Christopher) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

#16

(#16) MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Kelly A. McQuage. (Griffee, J.) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

24 #1

Exhibit Florida Complaint

#24

(#24) NOTICE by Kelly A. McQuage re #16 Memorandum in Support of Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Florida Complaint)(Williams, Christopher) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

#23

(#23) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Safety Products, Inc, filed by Kelly A. McQuage. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Williams, Christopher) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

23 #1

Exhibit

23 #2

Exhibit

23 #3

Exhibit

14 #1

Exhibit A

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Williams, Christopher) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) NOTICE by Kelly A. McQuage re #16 Memorandum in Support of Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Florida Complaint)(Williams, Christopher) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Safety Products, Inc, filed by Kelly A. McQuage. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Williams, Christopher) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #14 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND HER COMPLAINT AND GRANTING #21 DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 1/3/2018. (shl) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Amended Complaint, Proposed Order Submitted, by Safety Products, Inc. (Davis, Emma) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Kelly A. McQuage has been filed. For future reference, please note: Filer failed to make the notation "Proposed Order Submitted". If no proposed order previously emailed to chambers, please do so upon receipt of this notice. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jae) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #14 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Kelly A. McQuage has been filed. For future reference, please note Filer failed to make the notation "Proposed Order Submitted". If no proposed order previously emailed to chambers, please do so upon receipt of this notice. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jae) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) REQUEST for Production of Documents by Kelly A. McQuage.(Griffee, J.) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) INTERROGATORIES Propounded to Defendant by Kelly A. McQuage.(Griffee, J.) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Kelly A. McQuage. (Griffee, J.) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kelly A. McQuage as to Safety Products, Inc. (Williams, Christopher) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Jana Davis Lamanna on behalf of Kelly A. McQuage (Lamanna, Jana) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by J. Mark Griffee on behalf of Kelly A. McQuage (Griffee, J.) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to Safety Products, Inc. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Summons by Christopher Michael Williams on behalf of Kelly A. McQuage. (Williams, Christopher) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • (#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • (#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • (#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jae) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Safety Products, Inc (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2922829), filed by Kelly A. McQuage. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Williams, Christopher) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.