This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2018 at 08:01:57 (UTC).

McNeil v. Ofc Smith et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 McNeil filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Ofc Smith. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judges overseeing this case are R Bryan Harwell and Kaymani D West. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-02348

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R Bryan Harwell

Referral Judge

Kaymani D West

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anson McNeil, Jr

Columbia, SC 29210

Defendants

Ofc Donald R Snyder

Myrtle Beach Police Dept

Ofc Smith

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Myrtle Beach Police Dept, Ofc Smith, Donald R Snyder, filed by Anson McNeil, Jr. Service due by 11/21/2018 (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(prou, ) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

1 #1

Envelope

12 #1

Envelope

#9

(#9) PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 9/25/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 9/4/2018. (prou, ) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

#12

(#12) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ofc Smith, Donald R Snyder, filed by Anson McNeil, Jr. Service due by 12/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(prou, ) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ofc Smith, Donald R Snyder, filed by Anson McNeil, Jr. Service due by 12/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(prou, ) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ***DOCUMENTS MAILED: #9 Proper Form Order w/NEF, one prisoner complaint form, one Financial Certificate, and two USM-285 Forms, placed in U.S. Mail to Anson McNeil, Jr, #301049, Kirkland Correctional Institution, 4344 Broad River Road, Columbia, SC 29210. (prou, ) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 9/25/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 9/4/2018. (prou, ) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • (#3) TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Florence. (prou, ) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Anson McNeil, Jr. Response to Motion due by 9/6/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Financial Certificate, #2 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(prou, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/12/2018: #3 Financial Certificate, #4 Envelope) (prou, ). (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Myrtle Beach Police Dept, Ofc Smith, Donald R Snyder, filed by Anson McNeil, Jr. Service due by 11/21/2018 (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(prou, ) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.