This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/25/2018 at 07:07:51 (UTC).

McNairy v. City of Chicago et al

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 McNairy filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Chicago. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Edmond E. Chang and Sheila M. Finnegan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-05127

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edmond E. Chang

Referral Judge

Sheila M. Finnegan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANDRE MCNAIRY

Defendants

E.A. RICHARDS

LAMONICA LEWIS

DEBRA KIRBY

ROBERT GONZALEZ

unidentified officers of the Chicago Police Department

CITY OF CHICAGO

KAREN ROWAN

L. PANEPINTO

DOUGLAS NICHOLS

PHILIP J. CLINE

RONALD WATTS

JOSE LOPEZ

ALVIN JONES

ELSWORTH J. SMITH, JR.

KALLATT MOHAMMED

MANUEL LEANO

JOHN GRIFFIN

other as yet unidentified officers of the Chicago Police Department

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott R. Rauscher

Attorney at Loevy and Loevy

311 N. Aberdeen Street, 3Rd Floor

Chicago, IL 60607

Arthur R. Loevy

Attorney at Loevy & Loevy

311 North Aberdeen, 3Rd Floor

Chicago, IL 60607

Jonathan I. Loevy

Attorney at Loevy & Loevy

311 N. Aberdeen, 3Rd Fl

Chicago, IL 60607

Sean Starr

Attorney at Loevy & Loevy

311 N. Aberdeen St., Third Floor

Chicago, IL 60607

Theresa H. Kleinhaus

Attorney at Loevy & Loevy

311 North Aberdeen, 3Rd Floor

Chicago, IL 60607

Russell R Ainsworth

Attorney at Loevy & Loevy

311 N Aberdeen Street, 3Rd Floor

Chicago, IL 60607

Joshua Alan Tepfer

Attorney at Loevy & Loevy

311 N. Aberdeen St., 3Rd Floor

Chicago, IL 60607

Defendant Attorneys

Brian Patrick Gainer

Attorney at Johnson & Bell, Ltd.

33 West Monroe Street, Suite 2700

Chicago, IL 60603

Monica Gutowski

Attorney at Johnson & Bell, Ltd.

33 W. Monroe St., Suite 2700

Chicago, IL 60603

Gary Jay Ravitz

Attorney at Ravitz & Palles, P.C.

203 North Lasalle Street, Suite 2100

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#28

#27

#26

#25

#24

#23

#22

#21

#20

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

2 #1

Status Report Requirements

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case referred to the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan pursuant to Local Rule 72.1. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/18/18. (tt, ) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Andre McNairy. Ronald Watts waiver sent on 8/21/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (Rauscher, Scott) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Andre McNairy. Karen Rowan waiver sent on 9/12/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. (Rauscher, Scott) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Status hearing held. Counsel reported on the status of the case. In light of the coordinated pretrial proceedings before Judge Wood, this Court will not set any discovery schedule and will defer to the coordinating judge. The parties should ensure service has been accomplished and appearances entered for all Defendants, Status hearing set for 11/08/2018 at 8:30 a.m.Emailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Kallatt Mohammed by Gary Jay Ravitz (Ravitz, Gary) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Ronald Watts by Monica Gutowski (Gutowski, Monica) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Ronald Watts by Brian Patrick Gainer (Gainer, Brian) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Andre McNairy. Kallatt Mohammed waiver sent on 8/21/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (Rauscher, Scott) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) STATUS Report - Joint Initial Status Report by Andre McNairy (Rauscher, Scott) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Andre McNairy. Debra Kirby waiver sent on 8/21/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (Rauscher, Scott) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Andre McNairy by Scott R. Rauscher (Rauscher, Scott) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Andre McNairy by Russell R Ainsworth (Ainsworth, Russell) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Andre McNairy by Arthur R. Loevy (Loevy, Arthur) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Andre McNairy by Joshua Alan Tepfer (Tepfer, Joshua) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Andre McNairy by Theresa H. Kleinhaus (Kleinhaus, Theresa) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Andre McNairy by Jonathan I. Loevy (Loevy, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pk, ) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang:Initial status hearing set for 09/05/2018 at 10:00 a.m. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements at least 3 business days before the initial status hearing. Plaintiff must still file the report even if not all Defendants have been served or have responded to requests to craft a joint report. Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel must read them anew even if counsel has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases. Emailed notice (Attachments: #1 Status Report Requirements) (slb, ) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. (acm) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by ANDRE MCNAIRY; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14749619. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rauscher, Scott) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Other is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Monica Gutowski

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gary Jay Ravitz

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian Patrick Gainer