This case was last updated from PACER on 11/23/2018 at 07:25:19 (UTC).

McKinnies v. City of Minneapolis et al

Case Summary

On 09/24/2018 McKinnies filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Minneapolis. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nancy E. Brasel and Becky R. Thorson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:18-CV-02738

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nancy E. Brasel

Referral Judge

Becky R. Thorson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rico McKinnies

Rico A. McKinnies

Defendants

Officer Chad Conner

Rachel Reiersgord

J Spies

City of Minneapolis

Officer J. Spies

Officer Rachel Reiersgord

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zorislav R Leyderman

Attorney at The Law Office of Zorislav R. Leyderman

222 South 9Th Street, Suite 1600

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Defendant Attorneys

Sharda R Enslin

Attorney at City of Minneapolis - City Attorney's Office

350 South Fifth Street, Room 210

Minneapolis, MN 55415

Brian Scott Carter

Attorney at Minneapolis City Attorney's Office

350 South Fifth Street, Room 210

Minneapolis, MN 55415

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER/NOTICE of Setting: ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Confidential Letter to Court due by 4/18/2019. Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 4/12/2019. Settlement Conference set for 4/22/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 10/25/2018. (MSK) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

#11

(#11) ORDER/NOTICE of Setting: PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 1/7/2019. Discovery due by 10/1/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 1/7/2019. Motions (non-disp) due 10/15/2019. Motions (disp) due by 3/20/2020. Ready for trial due by 7/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 10/25/2018. (MSK) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

#10

(#10) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/25/2018. (MSK) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

#9

(#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Rico A. McKinnies. Jointly Signed by City of Minneapolis, Officer Reiersgord, Officer Conner, and Officer Spies.(Leyderman, Zorislav) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint filed by City of Minneapolis, Chad Conner, Rachel Reiersgord, J. Spies. (Enslin, Sharda) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

6 #1

Consent Form

#6

(#6) ORDER/NOTICE of Setting: Pretrial Conference set for 10/24/2018 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 10/3/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (MSK) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#5

(#5) ORDER on #3 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 10/2/2018. (MSK) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

#4

(#4) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #3 Stipulation. (Enslin, Sharda) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

#3

(#3) STIPULATION for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by City of Minneapolis. Jointly Signed by Rico A. McKinnies. (Enslin, Sharda) Modified on 10/2/2018 (kt). (Entered: 10/01/2018)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal

1 #2

Summons and Complaint Complaint

1 #1

Summons and Complaint Summons

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County, case number unknown (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6391479) filed by City of Minneapolis. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint Summons, #2 Summons and Complaint Complaint, #3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Enslin, Sharda) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER/NOTICE of Setting: ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Confidential Letter to Court due by 4/18/2019. Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 4/12/2019. Settlement Conference set for 4/22/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 10/25/2018. (MSK) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER/NOTICE of Setting: PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 1/7/2019. Discovery due by 10/1/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 1/7/2019. Motions (non-disp) due 10/15/2019. Motions (disp) due by 3/20/2020. Ready for trial due by 7/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 10/25/2018. (MSK) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/25/2018. (MSK) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Rico A. McKinnies. Jointly Signed by City of Minneapolis, Officer Reiersgord, Officer Conner, and Officer Spies.(Leyderman, Zorislav) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to Complaint filed by City of Minneapolis, Chad Conner, Rachel Reiersgord, J. Spies. (Enslin, Sharda) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • (#7) (Text-only) NOTICE of Resetting of Hearing: The pretrial conference, originally set for 10/24/2018, is reset to 10/25/2018 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (MSK) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER/NOTICE of Setting: Pretrial Conference set for 10/24/2018 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 10/3/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (MSK) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER on #3 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 10/2/2018. (MSK) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #3 Stipulation. (Enslin, Sharda) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STIPULATION for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by City of Minneapolis. Jointly Signed by Rico A. McKinnies. (Enslin, Sharda) Modified on 10/2/2018 (kt). (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • (#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd, 4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 18-cv-2738 (NEB/BRT). (MMP) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County, case number unknown (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6391479) filed by City of Minneapolis. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint Summons, #2 Summons and Complaint Complaint, #3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Enslin, Sharda) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less