This case was last updated from PACER on 12/11/2018 at 07:13:24 (UTC).

Mcintyre v. RentGrow Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/12/2018 Mcintyre filed an Other lawsuit against RentGrow Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Allison D. Burroughs. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-12141

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Allison D. Burroughs

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patricia Mcintyre

Defendant

RentGrow Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher M. Lefebvre

Po Box 479

Pawtucket, RI 02862

James A. Francis

Attorney at Francis & Mailman, P.C.

Land Title Building, 100 South Broad Street, 19Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19110

John Soumilas

Attorney at Francis & Mailman PC

Land Title Building, 19Th Floor, 100 South Broad Street

Philadelphia, PA 19110

Defendant Attorney

Matthew J. Frankel

Attorney at Nixon Peabody LLP

One Citizens Plaza

Providence, RI 02903

 

Court Documents

8 #1

Affidavit Aff in Support of PVH

#8

(#8) Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of John Soumilas Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7439391 by Patricia Mcintyre. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Aff in Support of PVH)(Lefebvre, Christopher) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

7 #1

Affidavit Aff in Support of PVH

#7

(#7) Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of James A. Francis Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7439356 by Patricia Mcintyre. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Aff in Support of PVH)(Lefebvre, Christopher) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed RentGrow Inc. served on 10/23/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. (Lefebvre, Christopher) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

#4

(#4) Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by RentGrow Inc..(Frankel, Matthew) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to RentGrow Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Pacho, Arnold) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

1 #2

Category Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against RentGrow Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7363337 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by RentGrow Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lefebvre, Christopher) (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/12/2018) (Pacho, Arnold). (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/12/2018) (Pacho, Arnold). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/12/2018: #2 Category Form) (Pacho, Arnold). Modified on 10/12/2018 to attach complaint and flatten pdfs (Pacho, Arnold). (Entered: 10/12/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added John Soumilas. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added James A. Francis. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of John Soumilas Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7439391 by Patricia Mcintyre. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Aff in Support of PVH)(Lefebvre, Christopher) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of James A. Francis Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7439356 by Patricia Mcintyre. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Aff in Support of PVH)(Lefebvre, Christopher) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed RentGrow Inc. served on 10/23/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. (Lefebvre, Christopher) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to 12/13/18 to respond to complaint. (Folan, Karen) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by RentGrow Inc..(Frankel, Matthew) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to RentGrow Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Pacho, Arnold) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • (#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against RentGrow Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7363337 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by RentGrow Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lefebvre, Christopher) (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/12/2018) (Pacho, Arnold). (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/12/2018) (Pacho, Arnold). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/12/2018: #2 Category Form) (Pacho, Arnold). Modified on 10/12/2018 to attach complaint and flatten pdfs (Pacho, Arnold). (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.