This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2018 at 07:40:02 (UTC).

McGraw v. Andrews

Case Summary

On 08/24/2018 McGraw filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Andrews. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is James C. Dever, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-HC-02212

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James C. Dever, III

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Oscar McGraw

Butner, NC 27509

Respondent

Justin Andrews

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Envelope

#1

(#1) PETITION (unsigned) for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Oscar McGraw. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Envelope) (Indig, A.) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#2

(#2) Letter regarding case opening sent via US Mail to Oscar McGraw at Butner Medium II - F.C.I. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

1 #1

Memorandum in Support

#3

(#3) ORDER of Deficiency. The petition is not signed AND the filing fee of $5.00 was not received or application to proceed without payment of fees and affidavit was not submitted. Response due by 9/17/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 8/27/2018. Copy sent to petitioner via US Mail. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2018
  • Case Submitted to Chief Judge James C. Dever III regarding order of deficiency and petition review. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • Case Submitted to Chief Judge James C. Dever III regarding petition review. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number RAL066440. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER of Deficiency. The petition is not signed AND the filing fee of $5.00 was not received or application to proceed without payment of fees and affidavit was not submitted. Response due by 9/17/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 8/27/2018. Copy sent to petitioner via US Mail. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Letter regarding case opening sent via US Mail to Oscar McGraw at Butner Medium II - F.C.I. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION (unsigned) for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Oscar McGraw. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Envelope) (Indig, A.) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.