This case was last updated from PACER on 09/09/2018 at 07:45:00 (UTC).

McCugh v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al

Case Summary

On 07/11/2018 McCugh filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen K. Caldwell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00450

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen K. Caldwell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cyndy McCugh

Defendants

Bristol-Myers Squibb Company

AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP

McKesson Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel C. Burke

Attorney at Bernstein Liebhard LLP

10 E. 40Th Street, 28Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to McKesson Corporation. (pne) [Transferred from nysd on 7/11/2018.] (Entered: 04/04/2018)

#10

(#10) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New York Southern. Case number 1:18-cv-02893. File and docket sheet received electronically. cc: COR w/ docket sheet (Entered: 07/11/2018)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Cyndy McCugh. (Burke, Daniel) [Transferred from nysd on 7/11/2018.] (Entered: 04/02/2018)

10 #1

*Restricted*

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Burke, Daniel) [Transferred from nysd on 7/11/2018.] (Entered: 04/02/2018)

#6

(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (pne) [Transferred from nysd on 7/11/2018.] (Entered: 04/04/2018)

#9

(#9) CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - Eastern District of Kentucky. (Signed by MDL Panel on 07/06/2018) (sjo) [Transferred from nysd on 7/11/2018.] (Entered: 07/11/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14885291)Document filed by Cyndy McCugh.(Burke, Daniel) [Transferred from nysd on 7/11/2018.] (Entered: 04/02/2018)

#7

(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (pne) [Transferred from nysd on 7/11/2018.] (Entered: 04/04/2018)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to McKesson Corporation, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Cyndy McCugh. (Burke, Daniel) [Transferred from nysd on 7/11/2018.] (Entered: 04/02/2018)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Cyndy McCugh. (Burke, Daniel) [Transferred from nysd on 7/11/2018.] (Entered: 04/02/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2018
  • REMARK: Counsel shall refer to #www.kyed.uscourts.gov/518-md-02809-kkc for review of Orders relative to filing procedures in MDL 2809. If you are not registered as an ECF Filing User, please complete the ECF Registration Form and return it to the Clerk within twenty-one (21) days. cc: Order Regarding Practice & Procedure upon Transfer filed February 9, 2018 served via U.S. Mail to counsel not registered as ECF Filing Users. (TDA) (Entered: 07/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • Conflict Check run. (TDA) (Entered: 07/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New York Southern. Case number 1:18-cv-02893. File and docket sheet received electronically. cc: COR w/ docket sheet (Entered: 07/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - Eastern District of Kentucky. (sjo) [Transferred from nysd on 7/11/2018.] (Entered: 07/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - Eastern District of Kentucky. (Signed by MDL Panel on 07/06/2018) (sjo) [Transferred from nysd on 7/11/2018.] (Entered: 07/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to McKesson Corporation. (pne) [Transferred from nysd on 7/11/2018.] (Entered: 04/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (pne) [Transferred from nysd on 7/11/2018.] (Entered: 04/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (pne) [Transferred from nysd on 7/11/2018.] (Entered: 04/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • Case Designated ECF. (pne) [Transferred from nysd on 7/11/2018.] (Entered: 04/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne) [Transferred from nysd on 7/11/2018.] (Entered: 04/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne) [Transferred from nysd on 7/11/2018.] (Entered: 04/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to McKesson Corporation, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Cyndy McCugh. (Burke, Daniel) [Transferred from nysd on 7/11/2018.] (Entered: 04/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Cyndy McCugh. (Burke, Daniel) [Transferred from nysd on 7/11/2018.] (Entered: 04/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Cyndy McCugh. (Burke, Daniel) [Transferred from nysd on 7/11/2018.] (Entered: 04/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Burke, Daniel) [Transferred from nysd on 7/11/2018.] (Entered: 04/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14885291)Document filed by Cyndy McCugh.(Burke, Daniel) [Transferred from nysd on 7/11/2018.] (Entered: 04/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.