This case was last updated from PACER on 12/15/2018 at 07:51:14 (UTC).

McCloud v. Lehman et al

Case Summary

On 10/16/2018 McCloud filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Lehman. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are John Preston Bailey and James P. Mazzone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00106

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Preston Bailey

Referral Judge

James P. Mazzone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Adam Christopher McCloud

St. Marys, WV 26170

Defendants

Dr. James Beane

Dr. Lehman

Wexford Health Services, Inc.

 

Court Documents

#11

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

(#9) RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/22/18. (njz) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

#8

(#8) RETURN RECEIPT as to #7 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/22/18. (njz) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

7 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#7

(#7) ORDER GRANTING #2 PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. An initial partial filing fee of $2.70 is due. If the plaintiff fails to pay the initial filing fee within twenty-eight (28) days of the entry of this Order, the Court will DISMISS this action without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 10/17/18. (njz) copy mailed to pro se pla via cert. return rec't mail; copy mailed to Trustee with executed Consent to Collect form via regular mail; copy emailed to fin clerk Elkins with executed Consent to Collect form. (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/17/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (njz). (Entered: 10/17/2018)

6 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#6

(#6) NOTICE of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se In Federal Court. (njz) copy mailed to pro se pla via cert. return rec't mail (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/17/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (njz). (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#5

RESTRICTED

#2

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

1 #4

Exhibit 3-Screening Certificate of Merit Notification

1 #3

Exhibit 2-Notice of Intent to File Suit Under 42 USC 1983

1 #2

Exhibit 1-Policy Directive 2/1/14

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against James Beane, Lehman, Wexford Health Services, Inc. filed by Adam Christopher McCloud. (Attachments: #1 A-Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 1-Policy Directive 2/1/14, #3 Exhibit 2-Notice of Intent to File Suit Under 42 USC 1983, #4 Exhibit 3-Screening Certificate of Merit Notification)(njz) case assigned to Judge Bailey, MJ Mazzone, and LC Blalock (Entered: 10/16/2018)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Partial Filing fee: $ 12.08, receipt number WVNE013328. (cnd) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Initial Partial Filing fee: $ 2.70 receipt number WVNE013213. (njz) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/22/18. (njz) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RETURN RECEIPT as to #7 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/22/18. (njz) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER GRANTING #2 PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. An initial partial filing fee of $2.70 is due. If the plaintiff fails to pay the initial filing fee within twenty-eight (28) days of the entry of this Order, the Court will DISMISS this action without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 10/17/18. (njz) copy mailed to pro se pla via cert. return rec't mail; copy mailed to Trustee with executed Consent to Collect form via regular mail; copy emailed to fin clerk Elkins with executed Consent to Collect form. (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/17/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (njz). (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se In Federal Court. (njz) copy mailed to pro se pla via cert. return rec't mail (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/17/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (njz). (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Envelope Received re: #1 , #2 , #3 , #4 . (njz) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Adam Christopher McCloud. (Attachments: #1 Ledger)(njz) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by Adam Christopher McCloud. (njz) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Adam Christopher McCloud. (njz) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against James Beane, Lehman, Wexford Health Services, Inc. filed by Adam Christopher McCloud. (Attachments: #1 A-Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 1-Policy Directive 2/1/14, #3 Exhibit 2-Notice of Intent to File Suit Under 42 USC 1983, #4 Exhibit 3-Screening Certificate of Merit Notification)(njz) case assigned to Judge Bailey, MJ Mazzone, and LC Blalock (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.