This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/20/2019 at 07:31:04 (UTC).

McCarthy v. NCC Business Services Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 11/21/2018 McCarthy filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against NCC Business Services Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is James A Teilborg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-04183

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James A Teilborg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kevin F McCarthy, II

Defendants

Experian Information Solutions Incorporated

Equifax Information Services LLC

Trans Union LLC

NCC Business Services Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jacob Wayne Hippensteel

Attorney at McCarthy Law PLC

4250 N Drinkwater Blvd., Ste. 320

Scottsdale, AZ 85251

Kevin Fallon McCarthy

Attorney at McCarthy Law PLC

4250 N Drinkwater Blvd., Ste. 320

Scottsdale, AZ 85251

Defendant Attorneys

Sheereen Javadizadeh

Attorney at Jones Day - Irvine, CA

3161 Michelson Dr., Ste. 800

Irvine, CA 92612

Emily Gildar Wagner

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer LLP - Phoenix, AZ

1 Arizona Center, 400 E Van Buren

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2202

Melissa S Ho

Attorney at Polsinelli PC - Phoenix, AZ

1 E Washington St., Ste. 1200

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Adiba Jurayeva

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer LLP - Phoenix, AZ

1 Arizona Center, 400 E Van Buren

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2202

Maria Fernanda Hubbard

Attorney at Polsinelli PC - Phoenix, AZ

1 E Washington St., Ste. 1200

Phoenix, AZ 85004

John Neil Stuart

Attorney at Cohen Dowd Quigley PC

2425 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 1100

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Daniel P Quigley

Attorney at Cohen Dowd Quigley PC

2425 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 1100

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Jennifer Elaine Mullen

Attorney at Litchfield Cavo - Phoenix, AZ

7310 N 16Th St., Ste. 325

Phoenix, AZ 85020

 

Court Documents

#33

#31

#30

#29

#27

26 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#26

22 #1

Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] ORDER

#22

7 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#7

#4

#2

1 #4

Affidavit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC. (Ho, Melissa) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • (#32) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Senior Judge James A. Teilborg: Scheduling Conference held on 1/17/2019. Deadlines set. Order to issue. APPEARANCES: Jacob Hippensteel for Plaintiff. Jennifer Elaine Mullen for Defendant NCC Business Services Incorporated. Telephonic appearance by Sheereen Javadizadeh for Defendant Experian Information Solutions Incorporated. John Neil Stuart for Defendant Trans Union LLC. (Court Reporter Laurie Adams) Hearing held 10:04 AM to 10:53 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RMW) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Ho, Melissa) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Ho, Melissa) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa S Ho on behalf of Equifax Information Services LLC. (Ho, Melissa) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) ORDER (Text Only): IT IS ORDERED that the motion for leave to appear telephonically (Doc. #26 ) is granted. However, because the Court holds Rule 16 conferences in a group, and because the Court can accept only one phone call, Counsel Sheereen Javadizadeh must contact Ann-Martha Andrews (602-778-3700) who is also appearing telephonically (for CV 18-3062) and be on a conference call with Ms. Andrews when they call into the Court (at 602-322-7560) at the time set for the hearing. Ordered by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 1/8/2019. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RMW) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Kevin F McCarthy, II. (Hippensteel, Jacob) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at the January 17, 2019 Scheduling Conference by Experian Information Solutions Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Javadizadeh, Sheereen) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ORDER re: #22 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint : IT IS ORDERED that the stipulation for extension of time to answer (Doc. #22 ) is denied. (See attached order for further information.) Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 1/3/2019. (RMW) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #23 Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DXD) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by NCC Business Services Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) *Corporate Disclosure Statement by NCC Business Services Incorporated identifying Other Affiliate QBE North America for NCC Business Services Incorporated. (Mullen, Jennifer) *Modified to correct corporate party on 11/27/2018 (REK). (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Additional Attachments to Main Document re: 5 Notice of Deficiency (Text Only), #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant NCC Business Services Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mullen, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • ***STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED: ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand with Jury Demand by Trans Union LLC. ENTERED IN DISTRICT COURT FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES*** (KEP) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by NCC Business Services Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(c) - Documents shall be converted to PDF directly from a word processing program and per Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual must be text searchable. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KEP) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by NCC Business Services Incorporated. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile with correct PDF document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KEP) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to NCC Business Services Incorporated. (KEP) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16225173. This case has been assigned to the Honorable James A. Teilborg. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-4183-PHX-JAT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KEP) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from McDowell Mountain Justice Court, case number CC2018-221930RC. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16225173 filed by NCC Business Services Incorporated. (Mullen, Jennifer) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit, #4 Affidavit)(KEP) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NCC Business Services Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Trans Union Corp is a litigant