This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/05/2019 at 07:25:21 (UTC).

McCalister v. Stukey et al

Case Summary

On 11/06/2018 McCalister filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Stukey. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Kristine G. Baker and J. Thomas Ray. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00283

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kristine G. Baker

Referral Judge

J. Thomas Ray

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Justin McCalister

Wrightsville, AR 72183-1010

Defendants

McGuire

Bland

Stukey

Eason

Carolyn Eason

Chelsea McGuire

Ronald Stukey

Estella Bland

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel L. McFadden

Attorney at Arkansas Attorney General's Office

Catlett-Prien Tower Building, 323 Center Street, Suite 200

Little Rock, AR 72201-2610

Brent Jay Eubanks

Attorney at Humphries, Odum & Eubanks

1901 South Broadway

Little Rock, AR 72206

 

Court Documents

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER denying #5 McCalister's Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 1/3/2019. (kdr) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) SCHEDULING ORDER directing the Clerk to amend the docket sheet to reflect that: Defendant "Doctor Stukey" is now Dr. Ronald Stukey; Defendant "Nurse Bland" is now Estella Bland; Defendant "Lieutenant Eason" is now Lieutenant Carolyn Eason; and Defendant "Correctional Officer McGuire" is now Chelsea McGuire; directing defendants to file any motions on the issue of exhaustion, on or before 7/31/2019; and granting Defendants permission to depose Plaintiff, if they so choose. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 1/2/2019. (kdr) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE, CONSENT AND REFERENCE to a Magistrate Judge forwarded by the Clerk of Court. (tjb) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Separate Defendants' ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Eason, McGuire.(McFadden, Daniel) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel L. McFadden on behalf of Eason, McGuire (McFadden, Daniel) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed. Bland served on 12/5/2018. (fjg) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed. Stukey served on 12/5/2018. (fjg) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed. McGuire served on 12/3/2018. (fjg) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed. Eason served on 12/3/2018. (fjg) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Letter to the Court from Justin McCalister. (llg) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Bland, Stukey.(Eubanks, Brent) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Brent Jay Eubanks on behalf of Bland, Stukey (Eubanks, Brent) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Change of Address by Justin McCalister (kbc) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Justin McCalister. (kdr) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Bland, Eason, McGuire, and Stukey. Forwarded to USMS for service. (kdr) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER allowing McCalister to proceed with his inadequate medical care claims against Doctor Stukey, APN Bland, Lieutenant Eason and Correctional Officer McGuire; directing the Clerk to prepare a summons for Stukey and Bland; directing the USMS to serve the summons and #2 Complaint, and this Order on Stukey and Bland through the Humphries, Odum & Eubanks law firm without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor; and directing the Clerk to prepare a summons for Eason and McGuire; directing the USMS to serve the summons and #2 Complaint, and this Order, on Eason and McGuire through the ADC Compliance Division without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 11/9/2018. (kdr) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS granting #1 IFP motion; directing monthly payments be collected from Plaintiff's institutional account, until a total of $350 has been paid to the Clerk; and directing the Clerk to send a copy of tis Order to the Warden and the appropriate ADC offices. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 11/8/2018. (kdr) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Justin McCalister.(kdr) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Justin McCalister. (kdr) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Eason is a litigant

Latest cases where McGuire is a litigant

Latest cases where Bland is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel Louis McFadden