This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2020 at 20:57:39 (UTC).

Mayor & City Council of Baltimore v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al

Case Summary

On 03/16/2018 Mayor City Council of Baltimore filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Purdue Pharma L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Catherine C. Blake. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00800

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Catherine C. Blake

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mayor & City Council of Baltimore

Defendants

McKesson Corporation

Endo Health Solutions, Inc.

Purdue Pharma L.P.

Purdue Pharma, Inc.

Allergan, Plc

Howard J. Hoffberg

Actavis, Inc.

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Cardinal Health, Inc.

Actavis, LLC

Actavis Pharma, Inc.

Watson Laboratories, Inc.

Cephalon, Inc.

The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Rosen-Hoffberg Rehabilitation and Pain Management Associates, P.A.

Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Suzanne Sangree

Attorney at City of Baltimore Law Department

City Hall Room 156, 100 N Holliday St

Baltimore, MD 21202

Andre M Davis

Attorney at Baltimore City Department Of Law

100 N. Holliday Street, Suite 101

Baltimore, MD 21202

Lydie Essama Glynn

Attorney at Baltimore City Law Department

7 East Redwood St

Baltimore, MD 21202

Defendant Attorney

John Arak Freedman

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

601 Massachusetts Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20001

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Endo International PLC for Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/19/2018)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mayor & City Council of Baltimore. Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 3/7/2018, answer due 3/28/2018.(bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/19/2018)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mayor & City Council of Baltimore. Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 2/14/2018, answer due 3/7/2018.(bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/19/2018)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued 60 days as to Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/19/2018)

2 #1

Case Information Report

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Allergan, Plc, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp., Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Howard J. Hoffberg, Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, McKesson Corporation, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Norman B. Rosen, Rosen-Hoffberg Rehabilitation and Pain Management Associates, P.A., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., filed by Mayor & City Council of Baltimore. (Attachments: #1 Case Information Report)(bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/19/2018)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore City, case number 24-C-18-0515. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637104781), filed by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/19/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Endo International PLC for Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketTHE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2-5) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE CITY. (bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mayor & City Council of Baltimore. Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 3/7/2018, answer due 3/28/2018.(bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mayor & City Council of Baltimore. Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 2/14/2018, answer due 3/7/2018.(bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued 60 days as to Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Allergan, Plc, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp., Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Howard J. Hoffberg, Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, McKesson Corporation, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Norman B. Rosen, Rosen-Hoffberg Rehabilitation and Pain Management Associates, P.A., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., filed by Mayor & City Council of Baltimore. (Attachments: #1 Case Information Report)(bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore City, case number 24-C-18-0515. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637104781), filed by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less