This case was last updated from PACER on 12/10/2018 at 10:05:15 (UTC).

Mayo v. Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 09/13/2018 Mayo filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ronald A. White and Steven P. Shreder. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-00313

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronald A. White

Referral Judge

Steven P. Shreder

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lonna Jo Mayo

Defendant

Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Casey L. Saunders

Po Box 2318

Ada, OK 74821

 

Court Documents

#1

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 9/20/2018)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

#4

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#11

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder: In light of #11 Plaintiff's Errata/Correction filed on 10/26/2018, #10 Plaintiff's Certificate of Electronic Service filed on 10/26/2018 is hereby STRICKEN as being filed in error. (ndd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ERRATA/CORRECTION (Re: #10 Certificate of Electronic Service (Social Security) ) by Lonna Jo Mayo (Saunders, Casey) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ***STRICKEN*** - CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE of Complaint re: Social Security Administration (Re: #2 Social Security Complaint ) by Lonna Jo Mayo (Saunders, Casey) Modified on 10/29/2018 to show stricken as filed in error per (12) Minute Order (ndd, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE of Complaint re: Social Security Administration (Re: #2 Social Security Complaint ) by Lonna Jo Mayo (Saunders, Casey) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Social Security Administration - U. S. Attorney (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Social Security Administration - Regional Counsel (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • (#6) MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White, referring case to Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder for all further proceedings in accordance with jurisdiction pursuant to 28 USC 636. All future filings shall bear the case number 18-cv-313-RAW-SPS. (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White: Granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis(acg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Lonna Jo Mayo Responses due by 10/1/2018(Saunders, Casey) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 9/20/2018)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration by Lonna Jo Mayo (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Lonna Jo Mayo (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.