This case was last updated from PACER on 12/14/2018 at 07:47:14 (UTC).

May et al v. Azar

Case Summary

On 10/15/2018 May filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Azar. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Wallace Capel, Jr and William Keith Watkins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00885

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Wallace Capel, Jr

Presiding Judge

William Keith Watkins

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Isaac W. May

Jean C. May

Defendant

Stephanie Azar

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Raley Livingston Wiggins

Attorney at Red Oak Legal PC

312 Catoma St - Ste 150

Montgomery, AL 36104

Defendant Attorney

Robert Flowers Northcutt

Attorney at Capell Howard PC

P O Box 2069

Montgomery, AL 36102-2069

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Isaac W. May, Jean C. May. (wcl, ) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#9

(#9) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Stephanie Azar re #8 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Northcutt, Robert) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

#13

(#13) RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion to Stay MOTION to Stay MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Isaac W. May, Jean C. May. (Wiggins, Raley) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jean C. May, Isaac W. May; Stephanie Azar served on 10/17/2018, answer due 11/7/2018. (wcl, ) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

#2

(#2) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Isaac W. May, Jean C. May. (wcl, ) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion to Stay by Stephanie Azar. (Northcutt, Robert). Added alternative MOTION to Stay and MOTION for More Definite Statement on 11/7/2018 as reflected in main PDF document (qc/djy, ). (Entered: 11/06/2018)

#8

(#8) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Stephanie Azar; Corporate Disclosures due by 11/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 standing order & format)(djy, ) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (defendant) Stephanie Azar. (djy, ) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

#11

(#11) ORDER directing any party wishing to consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction shall complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 12/4/2018, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 11/13/18. (djy, ) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

#12

(#12) Case reassigned to Chief Judge William Keith Watkins and Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr. Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (djy, ) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

8 #1

standing order & format

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Stephanie Azar (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602051024.), filed by Jean C. May, Isaac W. May. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt) (wcl, ) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

1 #2

Receipt

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Stephanie Azar and returned to counsel for personal service by process server. (wcl, ) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#10

(#10) ORDER directing that on or before 12/6/2018, plfs shall file a written response to the motion and SHOW CAUSE why the #6 Motion to Dismiss, Motion to Stay, Motion for More Definite Statement should not be granted; def may file a reply on or before 12/20/2018. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 11/8/18. (djy, ) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion to Stay MOTION to Stay MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Isaac W. May, Jean C. May. (Wiggins, Raley) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Case reassigned to Chief Judge William Keith Watkins and Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr. Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (djy, ) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER directing any party wishing to consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction shall complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 12/4/2018, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 11/13/18. (djy, ) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER directing that on or before 12/6/2018, plfs shall file a written response to the motion and SHOW CAUSE why the #6 Motion to Dismiss, Motion to Stay, Motion for More Definite Statement should not be granted; def may file a reply on or before 12/20/2018. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 11/8/18. (djy, ) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Stephanie Azar re #8 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Northcutt, Robert) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Stephanie Azar; Corporate Disclosures due by 11/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 standing order & format)(djy, ) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (defendant) Stephanie Azar. (djy, ) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion to Stay by Stephanie Azar. (Northcutt, Robert). Added alternative MOTION to Stay and MOTION for More Definite Statement on 11/7/2018 as reflected in main PDF document (qc/djy, ). (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jean C. May, Isaac W. May; Stephanie Azar served on 10/17/2018, answer due 11/7/2018. (wcl, ) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Isaac W. May, Jean C. May. (wcl, ) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Stephanie Azar and returned to counsel for personal service by process server. (wcl, ) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Isaac W. May, Jean C. May. (wcl, ) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Stephanie Azar (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602051024.), filed by Jean C. May, Isaac W. May. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt) (wcl, ) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.