This case was last updated from PACER on 06/17/2019 at 15:35:39 (UTC).

Maxon v. Sentry Life Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 04/12/2018 Maxon filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Sentry Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen L. Crocker and James D. Peterson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00254

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

Presiding Judge

James D. Peterson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Prudence F. Maxon

Defendant

Sentry Life Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Elizabeth A. Kramer

Attorney at Girard Sharp LLP

14Th Floor, 601 California St.

San Francisco, CA 94108-2805

Angelica M. Ornelas

Attorney at Girard Sharp LLP

601 California Street, 14Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

Patrick J. Stueve

Attorney at Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP

Suite 200, 460 Nichols Rd.

Kansas City, MO 64112

Matthew W. Lytle

Attorney at Miller Schirger LLC

Suite 1570, 4520 Main St

Kasas City, MO 64111

Daniel C. Girard

Attorney at Girard Sharp LLP

601 California Street, 14Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

Norman E. Siegel

Attorney at Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP

Suite 200, 460 Nichols Rd

Kansas City, MO 64112

John J. Schirger

Attorney at Miller Schirger, LLC

4520 Main Street, Suite 1570

Kansas City, MO 64111

John Allen Yanchunis, Sr.

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan, Tampa P.A.

7Th Floor, One Tampa City Center, 201 N Franklin Street

Tampa, FL 33602-5157

Ethan M. Lange

Attorney at Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP

Suite 200, 460 Nichols Road

Kansas City, MO 64112

Joseph Michael Feierabend

Attorney at Miller Schirger LLC

Suite 1570, 4520 Main St

Kasas City, MO 64111

Jason Toji Calabro

Attorney at Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP

460 Nichols Road, Suite 200

Kansas City, MO 64112

Norman Siegel

Attorney at Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP

460 Nichols Road, Suite 200

Kansas City, MO 64112

Andrew W. Erlandson

Attorney at Hurley, Burish & Stanton, S.C.

P.O. Box 1528

Madison, WI 53701

John Schirger

Attorney at Miller Schirger, LLC

4520 Main Street, Suite 1570

Kansas City, MO 64111

Defendant Attorneys

Shaunda Patterson-Strachan

Attorney at Carlton Fields Jorden Burt, PA

Suite 400 West, 1025 Thomas Jefferson St Nw

Washington, DC 20007-5208

Benjamine Reid

Attorney at Carlton Fields Jorden Burt, PA

Suite 4200, 100 Se 2Nd St

Miami, FL 33131-9101

Waldemar Jacob Pflepsen, Jr.

Attorney at Carlton Fields Jorden Burt, PA

Suite 400 West, 1025 Thomas Jefferson St Nw

Washington, DC 20007-5208

Clifton Richard Gruhn

Attorney at Carlton Fields, P.A.

100 Se Second St., Suite 4200

Miami, FL 33131

Kendall W. Harrison

Attorney at Godfrey & Kahn, S.C.

One East Main Street, Suite 500, P.O. Box 2719

Madison, WI 53701

7 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#134

(#134) Response to #133 Notice of Supplemental Authority by Plaintiff Prudence F. Maxon. (Siegel, Norman) Modified on 5/10/2019: Linked to the pending motion. (lak) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

133 #1

Exhibit A - Order on Motions, Taylor v. Midland National Life Ins. Co.

#133

(#133) Notice of Supplemental Authority by Defendant Sentry Life Insurance Company re: #73 Motion to Certify Class under Rule 23, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order on Motions, Taylor v. Midland National Life Ins. Co.) (Harrison, Kendall) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

#132

(#132) Reply on #128 Notice of Supplemental Authority by Plaintiff Prudence F. Maxon . (Feierabend, Joseph) Modified on 5/2/2019 (nln). (Entered: 05/02/2019)

131 #2

Exhibit B - Notice of Hearing 2013

128 #2

Exhibit B - Disregard. See 129.

128 #1

Exhibit A - Administrative Decision

#128

(#128) Notice of Supplemental Authority by Plaintiff Prudence F. Maxon re: #96 Brief in Opposition, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Administrative Decision, #2 Exhibit B - Disregard. See #129 .) (Feierabend, Joseph) Modified on 4/23/2019: Linked to the pending motion. (lak) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

#73

(#126) Motion for Hearing re: #73 Motion to Certify Class under Rule 23, #115 Motion for Leave to File Sur-reply, #92 MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS, #124 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply Responding to Plaintiff's Class Certification Reply by Plaintiff Prudence F. Maxon. Response due 4/18/2019. (Siegel, Norman) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Daniel C. Girard & Angelica M. Ornelas to appear pro hac vice by Prudence F. Maxon. (Yanchunis, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/12/2018.] (Entered: 09/14/2017)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #5 motion to appear pro hac vice. Within ten days of the date of this Order, Messrs. Stueve, Siegel, and Lange shall register to participate and docket in CM/ECF or show cause in writing within that time frame why they are unable to participate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 9/14/2017. (EC) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/12/2018.] (Entered: 09/14/2017)

#5

(#6) ORDER granting #5 motion to appear pro hac vice. Within ten days of the date of this Order, Messrs. Stueve, Siegel, and Lange shall register to participate and docket in CM/ECF or show cause in writing within that time frame why they are unable to participate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 9/14/2017. (EC) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/12/2018.] (Entered: 09/14/2017)

#4

(#4) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/31/2017. (GNB) copies e-mailed [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/12/2018.] (Entered: 08/31/2017)

#3

(#3) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/31/2017. (GNB) copies e-mailed [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/12/2018.] (Entered: 08/31/2017)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS issued as to Sentry Life Insurance Company.(Issued at intake). (DMA) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/12/2018.] (Entered: 08/30/2017)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Sentry Life Insurance Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400 receipt number ORL066560) filed by Prudence F. Maxon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(DMA) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/12/2018.] (Entered: 08/30/2017)

265 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#134) Response to #133 Notice of Supplemental Authority by Plaintiff Prudence F. Maxon. (Siegel, Norman) Modified on 5/10/2019: Linked to the pending motion. (lak) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#133) Notice of Supplemental Authority by Defendant Sentry Life Insurance Company re: #73 Motion to Certify Class under Rule 23, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order on Motions, Taylor v. Midland National Life Ins. Co.) (Harrison, Kendall) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#132) Reply on #128 Notice of Supplemental Authority by Plaintiff Prudence F. Maxon . (Feierabend, Joseph) Modified on 5/2/2019 (nln). (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#131) Declaration of Joseph M. Feierabend re: #128 Notice of Supplemental Authority, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email Exchange 2019-04-22, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Hearing 2013, #3 Exhibit C - Settlement Agreement 2017-06-20) (Feierabend, Joseph) Modified on 5/3/2019: Linked to the pending motion. (lak) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#130) Response to #128 Notice of Supplemental Authority by Defendant Sentry Life Insurance Company, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order of Wisconsin Commissioner of Insurance (July 19, 2017), #2 Exhibit B - Order (Jan. 13, 2015), #3 Exhibit C - Final Order (Mar. 23, 2015)) (Harrison, Kendall) Modified on 5/1/2019: Linked to the pending motion. (lak) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#129) Declaration of Joseph M. Feierabend filed by Plaintiff Prudence F. Maxon re: #92 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. (lak) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#128) Notice of Supplemental Authority by Plaintiff Prudence F. Maxon re: #96 Brief in Opposition, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Administrative Decision, #2 Exhibit B - Disregard. See #129 .) (Feierabend, Joseph) Modified on 4/23/2019: Linked to the pending motion. (lak) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#127) Brief in Opposition by Defendant Sentry Life Insurance Company re: #126 Motion for Hearing, filed by Prudence F. Maxon. (Harrison, Kendall) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#126) Motion for Hearing re: #73 Motion to Certify Class under Rule 23, #115 Motion for Leave to File Sur-reply, #92 MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS, #124 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply Responding to Plaintiff's Class Certification Reply by Plaintiff Prudence F. Maxon. Response due 4/18/2019. (Siegel, Norman) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#125) Response to #122 Notice of Supplemental Authority by Defendant Sentry Life Insurance Company. (Harrison, Kendall) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
132 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Daniel C. Girard & Angelica M. Ornelas to appear pro hac vice by Prudence F. Maxon. (Yanchunis, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/12/2018.] (Entered: 09/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting #5 motion to appear pro hac vice. Within ten days of the date of this Order, Messrs. Stueve, Siegel, and Lange shall register to participate and docket in CM/ECF or show cause in writing within that time frame why they are unable to participate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 9/14/2017. (EC) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/12/2018.] (Entered: 09/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Ethan M. Lange, appearing on behalf of Prudence F. Maxon (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL066827.) Related document: #5 MOTION for Patrick J. Stueve, Norman E. Siegel, and Ethan M. Lange to appear pro hac vice. (DMA) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/12/2018.] (Entered: 09/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Norman E. Siegel, appearing on behalf of Prudence F. Maxon (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL066826.) Related document: #5 MOTION for Patrick J. Stueve, Norman E. Siegel, and Ethan M. Lange to appear pro hac vice. (DMA) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/12/2018.] (Entered: 09/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Patrick J. Stueve, appearing on behalf of Prudence F. Maxon (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL066825.) Related document: #5 MOTION for Patrick J. Stueve, Norman E. Siegel, and Ethan M. Lange to appear pro hac vice. (DMA) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/12/2018.] (Entered: 09/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Patrick J. Stueve, Norman E. Siegel, and Ethan M. Lange to appear pro hac vice by Prudence F. Maxon. (DMA) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/12/2018.] (Entered: 09/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/31/2017. (GNB) copies e-mailed [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/12/2018.] (Entered: 08/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/31/2017. (GNB) copies e-mailed [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/12/2018.] (Entered: 08/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS issued as to Sentry Life Insurance Company.(Issued at intake). (DMA) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/12/2018.] (Entered: 08/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Sentry Life Insurance Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400 receipt number ORL066560) filed by Prudence F. Maxon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(DMA) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/12/2018.] (Entered: 08/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less