This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/03/2018 at 07:09:38 (UTC).

Matthew Wheatley v. MasterBrand Cabinets, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 Matthew Wheatley filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against MasterBrand Cabinets, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sheri Pym and Jesus G. Bernal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-02127

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Sheri Pym

Presiding Judge

Jesus G. Bernal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Matthew Wheatley

Defendants

DOES 1 through 100, Inclusive,

MasterBrand Cabinets, LLC

Does 1 through 100, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Melissa A LeBlanc

Edwin Aiwazian

Arby Aiwazian

Defendant Attorneys

David Samuel Rosenberg

Timothy L Hix

Jonathan D Meer

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings #13 filed by Defendant MasterBrand Cabinets, LLC. (Rosenberg, David) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

16 #2

Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant Masterbrand Cabinet, Inc.'s Reque

16 #1

Declaration of Melissa LeBlanc In Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Def

#16

(#16) OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings #13 filed by Plaintiff Matthew Wheatley. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Melissa LeBlanc In Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant Masterbrand Cabinet, Inc.'s Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, #2 Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant Masterbrand Cabinet, Inc.'s Request for Judicial Notice)(LeBlanc, Melissa) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

13 #4

Proposed Order

13 #3

Request for Judicial Notice In Support Thereof

13 #2

Declaration of David Rosenberg In Support Thereof

13 #1

Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof

#13

(#13) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Defendant MasterBrand Cabinets, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 12/3/2018 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof, #2 Declaration of David Rosenberg In Support Thereof, #3 Request for Judicial Notice In Support Thereof, #4 Proposed Order) (Rosenberg, David) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant MasterBrand Cabinets, LLC, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on October 4, 2018. (Rosenberg, David) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant MasterBrand Cabinets, LLC identifying Fortune Brand Home & Security, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Rosenberg, David) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

#5

(#5) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant MasterBrand Cabinets, LLC, identifying 1. Matthew Wheatley 2. Masterbrand Cabinets, Inc.. (Rosenberg, David) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

#4

(#4) DECLARATION of Melissa Stabenow re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant MasterBrand Cabinets, LLC. (Rosenberg, David) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

#3

(#3) DECLARATION of Chase Thornburgh re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant MasterBrand Cabinets, LLC. (Rosenberg, David) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant MasterBrand Cabinets, LLC. (Rosenberg, David) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#1

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant MasterBrand Cabinets, LLC, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on October 4, 2018. (Rosenberg, David) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/29/2018

(#18) SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. The hearing on the MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings [Doc. No. 13] is hereby continued to January 14, 2019, at 9:00 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 11/29/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/19/2018
View Court Documents

(#17) REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings #13 filed by Defendant MasterBrand Cabinets, LLC. (Rosenberg, David) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2018
View Court Documents

(#16) OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings #13 filed by Plaintiff Matthew Wheatley. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Melissa LeBlanc In Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant Masterbrand Cabinet, Inc.'s Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, #2 Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant Masterbrand Cabinet, Inc.'s Request for Judicial Notice)(LeBlanc, Melissa) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/06/2018
View Court Documents

(#15) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/05/2018
View Court Documents

(#14) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Matthew Wheatley. Motion set for hearing on 1/14/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Melissa LeBlanc In Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Melissa A LeBlanc added to party Matthew Wheatley(pty:pla)) (LeBlanc, Melissa) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/05/2018
View Court Documents

(#13) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Defendant MasterBrand Cabinets, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 12/3/2018 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof, #2 Declaration of David Rosenberg In Support Thereof, #3 Request for Judicial Notice In Support Thereof, #4 Proposed Order) (Rosenberg, David) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2018
View Court Documents

(#12) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Scheduling Conference set for 1/14/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2018
View Court Documents

(#11) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2018
View Court Documents

(#10) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2018
View Court Documents

(#9) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (esa) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2018

CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant MasterBrand Cabinets, LLC. (Filed in state court 10/3/18, submitted as document 1, attachment 2)(esa) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2018

CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does 1 through 100, inclusive, MasterBrand Cabinets, LLC, Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Matthew Wheatley. (Filed in state court 8/7/18, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2018
View Court Documents

(#8) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant MasterBrand Cabinets, LLC. (Rosenberg, David) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2018
View Court Documents

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant MasterBrand Cabinets, LLC, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on October 4, 2018. (Rosenberg, David) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2018
View Court Documents

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant MasterBrand Cabinets, LLC identifying Fortune Brand Home & Security, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Rosenberg, David) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2018
View Court Documents

(#5) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant MasterBrand Cabinets, LLC, identifying 1. Matthew Wheatley 2. Masterbrand Cabinets, Inc.. (Rosenberg, David) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2018
View Court Documents

(#4) DECLARATION of Melissa Stabenow re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant MasterBrand Cabinets, LLC. (Rosenberg, David) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2018
View Court Documents

(#3) DECLARATION of Chase Thornburgh re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant MasterBrand Cabinets, LLC. (Rosenberg, David) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2018
View Court Documents

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant MasterBrand Cabinets, LLC. (Rosenberg, David) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2018
View Court Documents

(#1) * NOTICE OF REMOVAL * filed as COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22529440 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant MasterBrand Cabinets, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Attorney David Samuel Rosenberg added to party MasterBrand Cabinets, LLC(pty:dft))(Rosenberg, David) Modified by Clerk on 10/5/2018 (esa). (Entered: 10/04/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less