This case was last updated from PACER on 10/21/2017 at 16:04:23 (UTC).

Matthew Grace, Et Al V. Dc, Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/26/2016 a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality case was filed by Matthew Grace against Dc in the jurisdiction of U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    16-7067

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Undetermined

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellants

District Of Columbia

Cathy L. Lanier, In Her Official Capacity As Chief Of Police For The Metropolitan Police Department

Plaintiff / Appellees

Matthew Grace

Pink Pistols

Amicus Curiae

Dc Appleseed Center For Law & Justice

Everytown For Gun Safety

The Brady Center To Prevent Gun Violence

Charles Nichols

State Of California

D.C. Vote

44 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document

MANDATE ISSUED to Clerk, U.S. District Court. [16-7067]

Open Document

PER CURIAM ORDER, En Banc, [1695463] filed granting motions for invitation to file briefs as amicus curiae in support of petitions for rehearing en banc [ # 1691022-2 ] in 16-7025, [ # 1691021-2 ] in 16-7067; The Clerk is directed to file Amicus brief [ # 1692045-2 ] in 16-7025, [ # 1691138-2 ] in 16-7067; denying petitions for rehearing en banc [ # 1690130-2 ] in 16-7025, [ # 1690132-2 ] in 16-7067. Before Judges: Garland, Henderson, Rogers, Tatel, Griffith, Kavanaugh, Srinivasan, Millett, Pillard, and Wilkins*. * Circuit Judge Wilkins did not participate in these matters. [16-7025, 16-7067]

Open Document

JOINT RESPONSE [1693095] to petition for rehearing en banc [ # 1690132-2 ] filed by Matthew Grace and Pink Pistols [Service Date: 09/15/2017 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail] Length Certification: 3897 Words. [16-7067] (Cooper, Charles)

Open Document

PER CURIAM ORDER, En Banc, [1695463] filed granting motions for invitation to file briefs as amicus curiae in support of petitions for rehearing en banc [ # 1691022-2 ] in 16-7025, [ # 1691021-2 ] in 16-7067; The Clerk is directed to file Amicus brief [ # 1692045-2 ] in 16-7025, [ # 1691138-2 ] in 16-7067; denying petitions for rehearing en banc [ # 1690130-2 ] in 16-7025, [ # 1690132-2 ] in 16-7067. Before Judges: Garland, Henderson, Rogers, Tatel, Griffith, Kavanaugh, Srinivasan, Millett, Pillard, and Wilkins*. * Circuit Judge Wilkins did not participate in these matters. [16-7025, 16-7067]

Open Document

AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1691138] LODGED by Everytown for Gun Safety [Service Date: 08/31/2017 ] Length of Brief: 2,592 Words. [16-7067]

Open Document #2

Amicus Brief (to lodge)

Open Document #1

Motion for Invitation for Leave to File Amicus Brief

Open Document

PETITION [1690132] for rehearing en banc filed by Appellants DC and Peter Newsham [Service Date: 08/24/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 3,889 words. [16-7067] (Johnson, Holly)

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1690931] filed directing Brian Wrenn, et al. and Matthew Grace, et al. to file a joint response to the petitions for rehearing en banc [ # 1690130-2 ] in 16-7025 and [ # 1690132-2 ] in 16-7067 within 15 days of the date of this order. The joint response may not exceed the length limitations established by the order. Absent an order of the court, a reply to the joint response will not be accepted for filing. [16-7025, 16-7067]

Open Document #2

Notice Sent

Open Document

REPLY [1617036] filed by DC and Cathy L. Lanier to response [ # 1616402-2 ] [Service Date: 06/06/2016 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [16-7067] (Johnson, Holly)

Open Document

RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1616402] filed by Matthew Grace and Pink Pistols to motion for other relief [ # 1615224-2 ] [Service Date: 06/02/2016 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 16-20. [16-7067] (Cooper, Charles)

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1616376] filed by Charles J. Cooper and co-counsel David H. Thompson and Peter A. Patterson on behalf of Appellees Matthew Grace and Pink Pistols. [16-7067] (Cooper, Charles)

Open Document

PER CURIAM ORDER [1615293] filed ORDERED that the district courts order filed May 17, 2016, granting appellees motion for a preliminary injunction, be administratively stayed pending further order of the court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellees file a response to the motion for stay pending appeal by 9:00 a.m. on Friday, June 3, 2016, and that appellants file any reply by 4:00 p.m. on Monday, June 6, 2016. The parties are directed to hand-deliver the paper copies of their submissions to the court by the time and date due. Before Judges: Rogers, Kavanaugh* and Wilkins (*Circuit Judge Kavanaugh would deny the administrative stay) [16-7067]

Open Document #2

Memorandum Opinion and Order

Open Document #1

Motion Filed

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1615220] filed by Holly M. Johnson and co-counsel Todd S. Kim; Loren L. AliKhan on behalf of Appellants DC and Cathy L. Lanier. [16-7067] (Johnson, Holly)

Open Document

NOTICE OF APPEAL [1615197] filed by DC and Cathy L. Lanier seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:15-cv-02234-RJL. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 16-7067. [16-7067]

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MANDATE ISSUED to Clerk, U.S. District Court. [16-7067]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PER ABOVE ORDER lodged Amicus brief [ # 1691138-2 ] is filed [16-7067]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PER CURIAM ORDER, En Banc, [1695463] filed granting motions for invitation to file briefs as amicus curiae in support of petitions for rehearing en banc [ # 1691022-2 ] in 16-7025, [ # 1691021-2 ] in 16-7067; The Clerk is directed to file Amicus brief [ # 1692045-2 ] in 16-7025, [ # 1691138-2 ] in 16-7067; denying petitions for rehearing en banc [ # 1690130-2 ] in 16-7025, [ # 1690132-2 ] in 16-7067. Before Judges: Garland, Henderson, Rogers, Tatel, Griffith, Kavanaugh, Srinivasan, Millett, Pillard, and Wilkins*. * Circuit Judge Wilkins did not participate in these matters. [16-7025, 16-7067]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JOINT RESPONSE [1693095] to petition for rehearing en banc [ # 1690132-2 ] filed by Matthew Grace and Pink Pistols [Service Date: 09/15/2017 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail] Length Certification: 3897 Words. [16-7067] (Cooper, Charles)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH TYPE-VOLUME LIMITS [1691248] for motion to participate as amicus curiae [ # 1691021-2 ] filed by Everytown for Gun Safety. [16-7067] (Gupta, Deepak)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1691138] LODGED by Everytown for Gun Safety [Service Date: 08/31/2017 ] Length of Brief: 2,592 Words. [16-7067]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CONSENT MOTION [1691021] to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Previously Filed] filed by Everytown for Gun Safety [Service Date: 08/31/2017 ] [16-7067] (Gupta, Deepak)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1690931] filed directing Brian Wrenn, et al. and Matthew Grace, et al. to file a joint response to the petitions for rehearing en banc [ # 1690130-2 ] in 16-7025 and [ # 1690132-2 ] in 16-7067 within 15 days of the date of this order. The joint response may not exceed the length limitations established by the order. Absent an order of the court, a reply to the joint response will not be accepted for filing. [16-7025, 16-7067]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION [1690132] for rehearing en banc filed by Appellants DC and Peter Newsham [Service Date: 08/24/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 3,889 words. [16-7067] (Johnson, Holly)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1685647] filed withholding issuance of the mandate. [16-7067]

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE [1618187] filed by Charles Nichols of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] [Service Date: 06/08/2016 ] [16-7067]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PER CURIAM ORDER [1618104] granting emergency motion for stay pending appeal [ # 1615224-2 ]. The district courts order filed May 17, 2016, is stayed pending appeal, and the administrative stay entered May 27, 2016, is dissolved. It is FURTHER ORDERED that consideration of this appeal be expedited. The Clerk is directed to calendar this case for oral argument on the same date and before the same panel as Wrenn v. District of Columbia, No. 16-7025. The following briefing schedule will apply: APPELLANTS' BRIEF due 06/29/2016. APPENDIX due 06/29/2016. APPELLEES' BRIEF due 07/20/2016. APPELLANTS' REPLY BRIEF due 08/03/2016. Before Judges: Griffith, Srinivasan and Millett. [16-7067]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY [1617036] filed by DC and Cathy L. Lanier to response [ # 1616402-2 ] [Service Date: 06/06/2016 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [16-7067] (Johnson, Holly)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1616402] filed by Matthew Grace and Pink Pistols to motion for other relief [ # 1615224-2 ] [Service Date: 06/02/2016 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 16-20. [16-7067] (Cooper, Charles)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1616376] filed by Charles J. Cooper and co-counsel David H. Thompson and Peter A. Patterson on behalf of Appellees Matthew Grace and Pink Pistols. [16-7067] (Cooper, Charles)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PER CURIAM ORDER [1615293] filed ORDERED that the district courts order filed May 17, 2016, granting appellees motion for a preliminary injunction, be administratively stayed pending further order of the court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellees file a response to the motion for stay pending appeal by 9:00 a.m. on Friday, June 3, 2016, and that appellants file any reply by 4:00 p.m. on Monday, June 6, 2016. The parties are directed to hand-deliver the paper copies of their submissions to the court by the time and date due. Before Judges: Rogers, Kavanaugh* and Wilkins (*Circuit Judge Kavanaugh would deny the administrative stay) [16-7067]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • EMERGENCY MOTION [1615224] filed by DC and Cathy L. Lanier for immediate administrative stay, stay pending appeal, and, in event of stay, abeyance. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 06/09/2016). (Response to Motion served by hand due on 06/06/2016) [Service Date: 05/27/2016 by Email, CM/ECF NDA, Hand Delivery] Pages: 16-20. [16-7067] (Johnson, Holly)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1615220] filed by Holly M. Johnson and co-counsel Todd S. Kim; Loren L. AliKhan on behalf of Appellants DC and Cathy L. Lanier. [16-7067] (Johnson, Holly)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL [1615197] filed by DC and Cathy L. Lanier seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:15-cv-02234-RJL. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 16-7067. [16-7067]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • PRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. [16-7067]

    Read MoreRead Less