This case was last updated from PACER on 01/08/2019 at 07:39:44 (UTC).

Matousek v. Planet Fitness

Case Summary

On 11/09/2018 Matousek filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against Planet Fitness. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lawrence R. Leonard and Raymond A. Jackson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00597

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lawrence R. Leonard

Presiding Judge

Raymond A. Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Susan Neal Matousek

Norfolk, VA 23518

Defendants

Planet Fitness

Ms. Chromen

Mr. Griffin

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #2 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Susan Neal Matousek. (epri, ) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

#5

(#5) Submission by Susan Neal Matousek. (epri, ) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT against Planet Fitness, filed by Susan Neal Matousek.(epri, ) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#2

(#2) DISMISSAL ORDER: Plaintiff's IFP Application, ECF No. 1, is GRANTED, and the Clerk is DIRECTED to file Plaintiff's Complaint. The Clerk is FURTHER DIRECTED to add Mr. Griffin and Ms. Chromen as named Defendants on the docket of this matter. However, for the reasons set forth in Order, this action is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. A copy of this Order was sent to plaintiff as DIRECTED on 11.28.18. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 11/26/2018. (epri, ) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#4

(#4) CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk on 11/28/2018. (epri, ) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#8

(#8) USCA Case Number 18-2429 4CCA Case Manager Cathy Poulsen for #6 Notice of Appeal filed by Susan Neal Matousek. (18-2429) (epri, ) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#7

(#7) Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #6 Notice of Appeal (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal)(epri, ) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

7 #1

Notice of Appeal

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) USCA Case Number 18-2429 4CCA Case Manager Cathy Poulsen for #6 Notice of Appeal filed by Susan Neal Matousek. (18-2429) (epri, ) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Assembled INITIAL Electronic Record Transmitted to 4CCA re #6 Notice of Appeal (epri, ) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #6 Notice of Appeal (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal)(epri, ) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #2 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Susan Neal Matousek. (epri, ) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk on 11/28/2018. (epri, ) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Submission by Susan Neal Matousek. (epri, ) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) COMPLAINT against Planet Fitness, filed by Susan Neal Matousek.(epri, ) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISMISSAL ORDER: Plaintiff's IFP Application, ECF No. 1, is GRANTED, and the Clerk is DIRECTED to file Plaintiff's Complaint. The Clerk is FURTHER DIRECTED to add Mr. Griffin and Ms. Chromen as named Defendants on the docket of this matter. However, for the reasons set forth in Order, this action is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. A copy of this Order was sent to plaintiff as DIRECTED on 11.28.18. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 11/26/2018. (epri, ) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Susan Neal Matousek. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint)(epri, ) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less