This case was last updated from PACER on 01/08/2019 at 07:39:16 (UTC).

Matousek v. Christian Psychotherapy

Case Summary

On 11/09/2018 Matousek filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against Christian Psychotherapy. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lawrence R. Leonard and Raymond A. Jackson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00595

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lawrence R. Leonard

Presiding Judge

Raymond A. Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Susan Neal Matousek

Norfolk, VA 23518

Defendants

Christian Psychotherapy

Dr. Huff

Jackie Butler

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) USCA Case Number 18-2430 4CCA Case Manager Cathy Poulsen for #6 Notice of Appeal filed by Susan Neal Matousek. (18-2430) (epri, ) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

7 #1

Notice of Appeal

#7

(#7) Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #6 Notice of Appeal (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal)(epri, ) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #2 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Susan Neal Matousek. (epri, ) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

#5

(#5) Submission by Susan Neal Matousek. (epri, ) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

#4

(#4) CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk on 11/27/2018. (epri, ) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT against Christian Psychotherapy, filed by Susan Neal Matousek.(epri, ) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#2

(#2) DISMISSAL ORDER: Plaintiff's IFP Application, ECF No. 1, is GRANTED, and the Clerk is DIRECTED to file Plaintiff's Complaint. The Clerk is FURTHER DIRECTED to add Jackie Butler and Dr. Huff as named Defendants on the docket of this matter. However, for the reasons set forth in Order, this action is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. A copy of this Order was sent to Plaintiff as DIRECTED on 11.27.18. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 11/26/2018. (epri, ) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) USCA Case Number 18-2430 4CCA Case Manager Cathy Poulsen for #6 Notice of Appeal filed by Susan Neal Matousek. (18-2430) (epri, ) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Assembled INITIAL Electronic Record Transmitted to 4CCA re #6 Notice of Appeal (epri, ) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #6 Notice of Appeal (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal)(epri, ) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #2 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Susan Neal Matousek. (epri, ) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Submission by Susan Neal Matousek. (epri, ) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk on 11/27/2018. (epri, ) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) COMPLAINT against Christian Psychotherapy, filed by Susan Neal Matousek.(epri, ) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISMISSAL ORDER: Plaintiff's IFP Application, ECF No. 1, is GRANTED, and the Clerk is DIRECTED to file Plaintiff's Complaint. The Clerk is FURTHER DIRECTED to add Jackie Butler and Dr. Huff as named Defendants on the docket of this matter. However, for the reasons set forth in Order, this action is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. A copy of this Order was sent to Plaintiff as DIRECTED on 11.27.18. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 11/26/2018. (epri, ) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Susan Neal Matousek. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint)(epri, ) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less