This case was last updated from PACER on 02/01/2019 at 07:56:51 (UTC).

Mathis v. Wasylyk et al

Case Summary

On 12/03/2018 Mathis filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Wasylyk. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Omar J. Aboulhosn and Irene C. Berger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-01487

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Omar J. Aboulhosn

Presiding Judge

Irene C. Berger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Roland Mathis

Beaver, WV 25813

Defendants

Dr. Irene Wasylyk, M.D.

Garland R. Ward, PA-C

ARH Appalachian Regional Health Care Hospital

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter and Envelope) (msa). Modified on 12/3/2018 (msa).

#2

(#2) STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (msa)

1 #1

Cover Letter and Envelope

#4

(#4) APPLICATION by Roland Mathis to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees and Costs. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn. (btm)

4 #1

Envelope

#3

(#3) ORDER: Directing that Plaintiff shall either pay the filing and administrative fee totaling $400 or file an Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by 1/4/2019; advising Plaintiff that failure to either pay the filing and administrative fee or file an Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by 1/4/2019, will result in a recommendation of dismissal of this matter without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Rule 41.1 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for the Southern District of West Virginia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 12/4/2018. (cc: Plaintiff - pro se with blank Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis) (btm)

#5

(#5) MAIL RETURNED AS UNDELIVERABLE. Document showing proof of filing requested by Plaintiff sent to Roland Mathis at FCI Beckley, Box 350 Federal Prison Camp, Beaver, WV 25813, via postage stamped envelope provided by Plaintiff. Mail resent to Roland Mathis at FCI Beckley, P. O. Box 350, Beaver, WV 25813. (btm)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MAIL RETURNED AS UNDELIVERABLE. Document showing proof of filing requested by Plaintiff sent to Roland Mathis at FCI Beckley, Box 350 Federal Prison Camp, Beaver, WV 25813, via postage stamped envelope provided by Plaintiff. Mail resent to Roland Mathis at FCI Beckley, P. O. Box 350, Beaver, WV 25813. (btm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) APPLICATION by Roland Mathis to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees and Costs. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn. (btm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER: Directing that Plaintiff shall either pay the filing and administrative fee totaling $400 or file an Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by 1/4/2019; advising Plaintiff that failure to either pay the filing and administrative fee or file an Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by 1/4/2019, will result in a recommendation of dismissal of this matter without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Rule 41.1 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for the Southern District of West Virginia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 12/4/2018. (cc: Plaintiff - pro se with blank Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis) (btm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (msa)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter and Envelope) (msa). Modified on 12/3/2018 (msa).

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.