This case was last updated from PACER on 01/09/2020 at 16:13:25 (UTC).

Match Group, LLC v. Bumble Trading Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/16/2018 Match Group, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Bumble Trading Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jeffrey C. Manske, Robert Pitman and Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-00080

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jeffrey C. Manske

Presiding Judges

Robert Pitman

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Counter Defendants and Cross Defendants

Match Group, LLC

IAC/InteractiveCorp

Counter Plaintiffs, Defendants and Cross Claimants

Bumble Trading Inc.

Bumble Holding, LTD

Worldwide Vision Limited

Badoo Technologies Limited

Badoo Limited

Badoo Software Limited

Magic Lab Co.

Badoo Trading Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Counter Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

John P. Palmer

Attorney at Naman Howell Smith & Lee

P.O. Box 1470

Waco, TX 76703-1470

Warren J. McCarty, III

Attorney at Caldwell Cassady and Curry PC

2101 Cedar Springs Rd., Ste 1000

Dallas, TX 75201

Bradley W. Caldwell

Attorney at Caldwell Cassady and Curry PC

2101 Cedar Springs Rd., Ste 1000

Dallas, TX 75201

John F. Summers

Attorney at Caldwell Cassady and Curry PC

2101 Cedar Springs Rd., Ste 1000

Dallas, TX 75201

Melissa Richards Smith

Attorney at Gillam and Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

Counter Plaintiff, Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

Joseph M. Drayton

Attorney at Cooley LLP

1114 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Theodore Stevenson, III

Attorney at McKool, Smith, P.C.

300 Crescent Court, Suite 1500

Dallas, TX 75201

Steven D. Wolens

Attorney at McKool Smith, P.C.

300 Crescent Court, Suite 1500

Dallas, TX 75201

Rose S. Whelan

Attorney at Cooley LLP

1299 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Suite 700

Washington, DC 20004-2400

Deron R Dacus

Attorney at The Dacus Firm, P.C.

821 Ese Loop 323, Suite 430

Tyler, TX 75701

Michael G. Rhodes

Attorney at Cooley, LLP

101 California Street, 5Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Matthew D. Caplan

Attorney at Cooley LLP

101 California Street, 5Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-5800

Jacques Jordan Lamothe

Attorney at Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

2475 Hanover Street

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Judd D. Lauter

Attorney at Cooley LLP

3175 Hanover Street

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Bo Bryan Jin

Attorney at Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

2475 Hanover Street

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Max A. Bernstein

Attorney at Cooley LLP

101 California Street, 5Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-5800

Harrison J Frahn, IV

Attorney at Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

2475 Hanover Street

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Samuel K. Whitt

Attorney at Cooley LLP

1299 Pennsylvania Ave., Nw, Suite 700

Washington, DC 20004

Frank Pietrantonio

Attorney at Cooley LLP

1299 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W., Suite 700

Washington, DC 20004

6 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#149

RESTRICTED

#148

(#148) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew D. Caplan on behalf of Frank Pietrantonio ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13040918) by on behalf of Badoo Limited, Badoo Software Limited, Badoo Technologies Limited, Badoo Trading Ltd., Bumble Holding, LTD, Bumble Trading Inc.. (Caplan, Matthew) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#147

RESTRICTED

#146

(#146) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew D. Caplan on behalf of Samuel K. Whitt ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13038440) by on behalf of Badoo Limited, Badoo Software Limited, Badoo Technologies Limited, Badoo Trading Ltd., Bumble Holding, LTD, Bumble Trading Inc.. (Caplan, Matthew) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#145

(#145) ORDER, Telephone Conference set for 1/7/2020 10:30 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

7 #1

Proposed Order

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Match Group, LLC. Bumble Trading Inc. served on 3/20/2018, answer due 4/10/2018. (Palmer, John) (Entered: 03/21/2018)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Bumble Trading Inc. (tb) (Entered: 03/20/2018)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Match Group, LLC. (Palmer, John) (Entered: 03/19/2018)

#3

(#3) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (jgb) (Entered: 03/19/2018)

#2

(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Match Group, LLC. (Palmer, John) (Entered: 03/16/2018)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-10579940). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Match Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Palmer, John) (Entered: 03/16/2018)

411 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Text Order GRANTING #148 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#149) Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 1-7-2020, Proceedings Transcribed: Telephonic Discovery Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristie Davis, Telephone number: 254-340-6114. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 1/29/2020, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/10/2020, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/7/2020, (kd) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#148) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew D. Caplan on behalf of Frank Pietrantonio ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13040918) by on behalf of Badoo Limited, Badoo Software Limited, Badoo Technologies Limited, Badoo Trading Ltd., Bumble Holding, LTD, Bumble Trading Inc.. (Caplan, Matthew) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#147) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Telephone Conference held on 1/7/2020. Case called for telephonic discovery hearing. Plaintiff's counsel discussed his position regardingdiscovery. Defendant spoke on their position. Court will permit the 3 requested depositions however hestates that they should be fairly short and if there are any issues during the deposition, counsel shouldcall to Court to intervene. There was discussion regarding the deposition of Mr. Diller. The Court saidthat Mr. Diller will not be deposed unless there was other information he has not been given. No furtherinformation was forthcoming. There was discussion on the Blackstone Agreement. The Court stated thatif the Blackstone Agreement can't be produced then it is very likely that this case may not go forward. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Kristie Davis.)(lad) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Text Order GRANTING #146 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#146) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew D. Caplan on behalf of Samuel K. Whitt ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13038440) by on behalf of Badoo Limited, Badoo Software Limited, Badoo Technologies Limited, Badoo Trading Ltd., Bumble Holding, LTD, Bumble Trading Inc.. (Caplan, Matthew) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#145) ORDER, Telephone Conference set for 1/7/2020 10:30 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#144) Sealed Document filed Match Group, LLC and IAC's Advisory Correspondence (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (lad) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Text Order GRANTING #143 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge Alan D Albright. The Motion is GRANTED, and the Clerk's Office is directed to file Match Group, LLC and IAC's Advisory Correspondence andsupporting Declaration shall remain under seal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#143) Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Sealed Document Ex. 1 - Advisory Correspondence, #2 Sealed Document Ex. A - Declaration of John F. Summers, #3 Proposed Order) (Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
168 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Text Order GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Having considered the Motion and the grounds therefor, the Court GRANTS Defendants Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Defendants deadline to respond is May 7, 2018.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (nc) (Entered: 03/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Bumble Trading Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Stevenson, Theodore) (Entered: 03/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Match Group, LLC. Bumble Trading Inc. served on 3/20/2018, answer due 4/10/2018. (Palmer, John) (Entered: 03/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Bumble Trading Inc. (tb) (Entered: 03/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Match Group, LLC. (Palmer, John) (Entered: 03/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (jgb) (Entered: 03/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (jgb) (Entered: 03/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (jgb) (Entered: 03/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Match Group, LLC. (Palmer, John) (Entered: 03/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-10579940). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Match Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Palmer, John) (Entered: 03/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.