This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/28/2018 at 13:16:05 (UTC).

Maryland Casualty Company et al v. Evanston Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 09/03/2015 Maryland Casualty Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Evanston Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John J Tuchi. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-01762

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John J Tuchi

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Assurance Company of America

Maryland Casualty Company

Defendants and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

American Safety Indemnity Company

Evanston Insurance Company

Counter Defendant, Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff

Evanston Insurance Company

3Rd Party Defendant and Counter Claimant

D.R. Horton Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William Courtland Reeves

Attorney at Morales Fierro & Reeves

3420 E Shea Blvd., Ste. 200

Phoenix, AZ 85028

Defendant, Counter Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew D Herold

Attorney at Herold & Sager - Phoenix, AZ

2375 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 600

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Jordan Ross Plitt

Attorney at Cavanagh Law Firm PA

1850 N Central Ave., Ste. 2400

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Steven James Gross

Attorney at Cavanagh Law Firm PA

1850 N Central Ave., Ste. 2400

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Steven Plitt

Attorney at Kunz Plitt Hyland & Demlong PC

3838 N Central Ave., Ste. 1500

Phoenix, AZ 85012-1902

Mark G Worischeck

Attorney at Sanders & Parks PC

3030 N 3Rd St., Ste. 1300

Phoenix, AZ 85012-3099

Shanks Leonhardt

Attorney at Sanders & Parks PC

3030 N 3Rd St., Ste. 1300

Phoenix, AZ 85012-3099

Andrew Abraham Mullen

Attorney at Herold & Sager

550 2Nd St., Ste. 200

Encinitas, CA 92024

Connie Totorica Gould

Attorney at Kunz Plitt Hyland & Demlong PC

3838 N Central Ave., Ste. 1500

Phoenix, AZ 85012-1902

William M Demlong

Attorney at Kunz Plitt Hyland & Demlong PC

3838 N Central Ave., Ste. 1500

Phoenix, AZ 85012-1902

Fulton Marcus Smith, III

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

101 Montgomery St., Ste. 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

Irene K Yesowitch

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

101 Montgomery St., Ste. 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

Teri Mae Rutledge

Attorney at Cozen OConnor - San Francisco, CA

575 Market St., Ste. 2200

San Francisco, CA 94105

Kevin Charles Barrett

Attorney at Barrett & Matura PC

8925 E Pima Center Pkwy., Ste. 100

Scottsdale, AZ 85258

John Robert Campo

Attorney at Branson Brinkop Griffith & Strong

643 Bair Island Rd, Ste 400

Redwood City, CA 94061

Alan M Posner

Attorney at Karbal Cohen Economou Silk & Dunne LLP

200 S Michigan Ave, 20Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60604

Robert S Murphy

Attorney at Law Office of Robert S Murphy LLC

1650 N 1St Ave.

Phoenix, AZ 85003-1124

Wayne S Karbal

Attorney at Karbal Cohen Economou Silk & Dunne LLC

150 S Wacker Dr., 17Th Fl.

Chicago, IL 60606

3Rd Party Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Rosary A Hernandez

Attorney at Tiffany & Bosco PA

2525 E Camelback Rd., 7Th Fl.

Phoenix, AZ 85016-9239

Richard Cameron Gramlich

Attorney at Tiffany & Bosco PA

2525 E Camelback Rd., 7Th Fl.

Phoenix, AZ 85016-9239

 

Court Documents

#50

#49

#48

#47

#46

#45

#44

#43

#14

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge John J Tuchi: Motion Hearing held on 8/31/2015. Plaintiffs' Motion to Sever Third-Party Claims #14 is argued to the Court. For reasons as stated on the record, IT IS ORDERED granting #14 Plaintiffs' Motion to Sever Third-Party Claims. Order to follow. APPEARANCES: Richard Gramlich for Plaintiffs. William Reeves for Defendants. Fulton Marcus Smith III for Third Party Defendant Evanston Insurance Company. Jordan Plitt for Third Party Defendant American Safety Indemity Company. Shanks Leonhardt for Third Party Defendant Scottsdale Insurance Company. Telephonic Appearance by John Campo for Third Party Greenwich Insurance Company. (Court Reporter Elaine Cropper.) Hearing held 2:55 PM to 3:52 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ACL) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Safety Indemnity Company. (ACL) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) ANSWER to #2 Third Party Complaint by American Safety Indemnity Company. (ACL) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) ORDER granting #45 Request for Hearing on #14 Motion to Sever Third Party Claims and #46 Stipulation to Request the Setting of Oral Argument. Motion Hearing set for 8/31/2015 at 02:45 PM in Courtroom 505, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge John J Tuchi. (ACL) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting #44 the Stipulated Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Third Party Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant American Safety Indemnity Company shall have until August 28, 2015, to file an Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Third Party Complaint. (ACL) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) STIPULATION re: Request Setting Oral Argument on #14 Motion to Sever. (ACL) Modified on 9/9/2015 (SJF). (Entered: 09/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) MOTION for Hearing on Motion #14 MOTION to Sever. (ACL) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT. (ACL) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Assurance Company of America and Maryland Casualty Company. (ACL) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) REPLY to Response to Motion re: #14 MOTION to Sever. (ACL) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER Extending Answer Deadline re: Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (ACL) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION of Dismissal re: Central Mutual Insurance Company. (ACL) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (ACL) Modified on 9/9/2015 (SJF). (Entered: 09/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Central Mutual Insurance Company. (ACL) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #2 Third Party Complaint by Central Mutual Insurance Company.(ACL) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (ACL). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 09/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Submitted by Assurance Company of America and Maryland Casualty Company. (ACL) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Submitted by Maryland Casualty Company. (ACL) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Maryland Casualty Company and Assurance Company of America. (submitted by William Reeves) (ACL) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ORDER granting Motion to Sever Third Party Complaint (Doc. 45 filed in CV-14-2507-PHX-JJT). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 9/3/2015. (ACL) (Entered: 09/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Maryland Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases where American Safety Indemnity Company, an Oklahoma corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where D R HORTON INC is a litigant