This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2018 at 07:52:15 (UTC).

Martinelli v. Neuschmid

Case Summary

On 10/02/2018 Martinelli filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Neuschmid. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James Donato and PSLC AGB. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-06030

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James Donato

Referral Judge

PSLC AGB

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Robert Anthony Martinelli

Vacaville, CA 95696

Respondent

Robert Neuschmid

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Robert Anthony Martinelli. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2018) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Filed byRobert Anthony Martinelli. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2018) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

1 #1

Exhibit

#3

(#3) MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Robert Anthony Martinelli. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2018) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#6

(#6) JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/26/18. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2018) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#4

(#4) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Robert Anthony Martinelli. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2018) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#5

(#5) ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge jam on 10/26/18. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2018) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/26/18. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2018) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge jam on 10/26/18. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2018) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Robert Anthony Martinelli. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2018) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Robert Anthony Martinelli. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2018) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Robert Anthony Martinelli. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2018) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Filed byRobert Anthony Martinelli. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2018) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.