This case was last updated from PACER on 06/30/2020 at 19:04:25 (UTC).

Martin v. Equifax Information Services , LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/20/2017 Martin filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Equifax Information Services , LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen J. Murphy, III and Anthony P. Patti. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:17-CV-11955

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen J. Murphy, III

Referral Judge

Anthony P. Patti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fred R Martin

Defendants

Equifax Information Services, LLC

Fifth Third Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nicholas A. Reyna

Attorney at Law Offices of Nicholas A. Reyna

17344 W 12 Mile Rd, Suite 106

Southfield, MI 48076

Defendant Attorney

Jordan S. Bolton

Attorney at Clark Hill PLC

151 S. Old Woodward Ave., Suite 200

Birmingham, MI 48009

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER OF DISMISSAL re #12 Stipulation. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar) (Entered: 10/03/2017)

#12

(#12) STIPULATION of Dismissal Between Plaintiff and Co-Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC by Fred R Martin (Reyna, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/28/2017)

#11

(#11) NOTICE by Fred R Martin (Settlement Between Plaintiff and Co-Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC only) (Reyna, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/30/2017)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Fred R Martin as to Fifth Third Bank (Reyna, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/24/2017)

#9

(#9) ORDER Requiring Joint Discovery Plan and Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, (Scheduling Conference set for 9/6/2017 09:30 AM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar) (Entered: 08/09/2017)

#8

(#8) NOTICE by Fred R Martin (Settlement Between Plaintiff and Co-Defendant Fifth Third Bank only) (Reyna, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/09/2017)

7 #1

Exhibit Certified Mailing Receipt

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Fifth Third Bank served on 7/5/2017, answer due 7/26/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mailing Receipt) (Reyna, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/20/2017)

#6

(#6) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Bolton, Jordan) (Entered: 07/20/2017)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Bolton, Jordan) (Entered: 07/20/2017)

4 #1

Exhibit Certified Mailing Receipt

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 6/30/2017, answer due 7/21/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mailing Receipt) (Reyna, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/06/2017)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued for *Fifth Third Bank* (DWor) (Entered: 06/20/2017)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Equifax Information Services, LLC* (DWor) (Entered: 06/20/2017)

1 #8

Exhibit G

1 #7

Exhibit F

1 #2

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Fred R Martin against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Fifth Third Bank with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6276129 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Kent - County Where Action Arose: Kent - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G) (Reyna, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/20/2017)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER OF DISMISSAL re #12 Stipulation. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar) (Entered: 10/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION of Dismissal Between Plaintiff and Co-Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC by Fred R Martin (Reyna, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Scheduling Conference on 9/6/2017 is Cancelled re #9 Order. (DPar) (Entered: 08/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE by Fred R Martin (Settlement Between Plaintiff and Co-Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC only) (Reyna, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Fred R Martin as to Fifth Third Bank (Reyna, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER Requiring Joint Discovery Plan and Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, (Scheduling Conference set for 9/6/2017 09:30 AM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar) (Entered: 08/09/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE by Fred R Martin (Settlement Between Plaintiff and Co-Defendant Fifth Third Bank only) (Reyna, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/09/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Fifth Third Bank served on 7/5/2017, answer due 7/26/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mailing Receipt) (Reyna, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Bolton, Jordan) (Entered: 07/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Bolton, Jordan) (Entered: 07/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 6/30/2017, answer due 7/21/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mailing Receipt) (Reyna, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued for *Fifth Third Bank* (DWor) (Entered: 06/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Equifax Information Services, LLC* (DWor) (Entered: 06/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Fred R Martin against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Fifth Third Bank with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6276129 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Kent - County Where Action Arose: Kent - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G) (Reyna, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less