This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/18/2018 at 07:21:37 (UTC).

MARTIN et al v. MSK MANAGEMENT, LLC. et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2018 MARTIN filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against MSK MANAGEMENT, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan D. Wigenton and Leda D. Wettre. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-11874

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan D. Wigenton

Referral Judge

Leda D. Wettre

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BENJAMIN BRISLAWN

JOSEPH MARTIN

Defendants

BOONTON PIZZA CORPORATION

ELIZABETH PIZZA CORPORATION

461 SPRINGFIELD AVE, LLC

JERSEY PIZZA, INC.

441-443 MLK BLVD., LLC

LEONIA PIZZA, INC.

JOHN DOE 1-10

115-125 SAINT GEORGES AVE. LLC

1046 CLINTON AVENUE, LLC

MOHAMMED S KHAN

SI PIZZA, INC.

JOHN DOE CORP. 1-10

479 POMPTON AVE. LLC

335 VALLEY ROAD, LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

KHAN ENTERPRISES, INC.

125 N. LEWIS ROAD LLC

PENN STREET PIZZA, INC.

MOUNT PENN PIZZA, INC.

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT W. SMITH

Attorney at SMITH EIBELER, LLC

101 Crawfords Corner Road

Holmdel, NJ 07733

 

Court Documents

21 #4

Certificate of Service

21 #3

Text of Proposed Order

21 #2

Certification

21 #1

Certification

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Andrew Kimble) by JOSEPH MARTIN. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Certification, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(SMITH, ROBERT) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NOTICE by JOSEPH MARTIN CONSENT TO JOIN-GIUSEPPE GUALITIERI (SMITH, ROBERT) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOSEPH MARTIN. MSK MANAGEMENT, LLC. waiver sent on 7/27/2018, answer due 9/25/2018. (SMITH, ROBERT) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOSEPH MARTIN. 461 SPRINGFIELD AVE, LLC waiver sent on 7/27/2018, answer due 9/25/2018. (SMITH, ROBERT) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOSEPH MARTIN. 125 N. LEWIS ROAD LLC waiver sent on 7/27/2018, answer due 9/25/2018. (SMITH, ROBERT) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOSEPH MARTIN. 115-125 SAINT GEORGES AVE. LLC waiver sent on 7/27/2018, answer due 9/25/2018. (SMITH, ROBERT) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOSEPH MARTIN. MOHAMMED S KHAN waiver sent on 7/27/2018, answer due 9/25/2018. (SMITH, ROBERT) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOSEPH MARTIN. 441-443 MLK BLVD., LLC waiver sent on 7/27/2018, answer due 9/25/2018. (SMITH, ROBERT) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOSEPH MARTIN. LEONIA PIZZA, INC. waiver sent on 7/27/2018, answer due 9/25/2018. (SMITH, ROBERT) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOSEPH MARTIN. JERSEY PIZZA, INC. waiver sent on 7/27/2018, answer due 9/25/2018. (SMITH, ROBERT) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOSEPH MARTIN. MOUNT PENN PIZZA, INC. waiver sent on 7/27/2018, answer due 9/25/2018. (SMITH, ROBERT) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOSEPH MARTIN. 335 VALLEY ROAD, LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY waiver sent on 7/27/2018, answer due 9/25/2018. (SMITH, ROBERT) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOSEPH MARTIN. BOONTON PIZZA CORPORATION waiver sent on 7/27/2018, answer due 9/25/2018. (SMITH, ROBERT) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOSEPH MARTIN. 1046 CLINTON AVENUE, LLC waiver sent on 7/27/2018, answer due 9/25/2018. (SMITH, ROBERT) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOSEPH MARTIN. SI PIZZA, INC. waiver sent on 7/27/2018, answer due 9/25/2018. (SMITH, ROBERT) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOSEPH MARTIN. ELIZABETH PIZZA CORPORATION waiver sent on 7/27/2018, answer due 9/25/2018. (SMITH, ROBERT) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOSEPH MARTIN. KHAN ENTERPRISES, INC. waiver sent on 7/27/2018, answer due 9/25/2018. (SMITH, ROBERT) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to 1046 CLINTON AVENUE, LLC, 115-125 SAINT GEORGES AVE. LLC, 125 N. LEWIS ROAD LLC, 335 VALLEY ROAD, LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, 441-443 MLK BLVD., LLC, 461 SPRINGFIELD AVE, LLC, 479 POMPTON AVE. LLC, BOONTON PIZZA CORPORATION, ELIZABETH PIZZA CORPORATION, JERSEY PIZZA, INC., MOHAMMED S KHAN, KHAN ENTERPRISES, INC., LEONIA PIZZA, INC., MOUNT PENN PIZZA, INC., MSK MANAGEMENT, LLC., PENN STREET PIZZA, INC., SI PIZZA, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • Case assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (jr) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8897468) with JURY DEMAND, filed by JOSEPH MARTIN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SMITH, ROBERT) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBERT W. SMITH