This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/19/2020 at 05:20:35 (UTC).

Martin Dale Davis v. Barry County, Missouri

Case Summary

On 11/19/2018 Martin Dale Davis filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Barry County, Missouri. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are M. Douglas Harpool and Roseann Ketchmark. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-05103

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

M. Douglas Harpool

Roseann Ketchmark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Martin Dale Davis

Harrison, AR 72601

Defendants

Barry County, Missouri

Naomi Daniel

Michael Lane

Jim Smith

Nick Hill

Tammy Arnold

Jamie Weston

Mick Epperly

Bud Bland

Michael Gallahue

Gary Davis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

J Andrew Hirth

Attorney at TGH Litigation LLC

28 N. 8Th Street, Suite 317

Columbia, MO 65201

Defendant Attorneys

David S. Baker

Attorney at Fisher, Patterson, Sayler & Smith - KCMO

51 Corporate Woods, 9393 West 110Th Street, Suite 300

Overland Park, KS 66210

Jeannette Lynn Wolpink

Attorney at Fisher, Patterson, Sayler & Smith - OPKS

51 Corporate Woods, 9393 West 110Th Street, Suite 300

Overland Park, KS 66210

 

Court Documents

#32

#31

#30

#29

#28

#27

#26

25 #1

Exhibit A - Obituary

#25

#6

#5

4 #1

Exhibit A

#4

#2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B - Notice of Service of Removal to Circuit Court

1 #1

Exhibit A - Petition

#1

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Order of Dismissal with prejudice per #32 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed on August 12, 2019 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Wheeler, LaTandra) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) STIPULATION of dismissal by Plaintiff and by Tammy Arnold, Barry County, Missouri, Bud Bland, Naomi Daniel, Gary Davis, Mick Epperly, Michael Gallahue, Nick Hill, Michael Lane, Jim Smith, Jamie Weston. (Baker, David) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Nancy Kenner(Baker, David) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) THIRD AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: The only date changed is the status conference. Status Conference set for 9/13/2019 02:00 PM in (VJC), Springfield before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. Signed on 6/12/2019 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Stout, Courtney) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff's counsel to file a proper motion to substitute parties or show cause why the claims against Defendant Jamie Weston should not be dismissed by 8/15/2019. Signed on 6/3/2019 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Phillips, Caleb) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) This Order has been amended. Please refer to the Third Amended Scheduling Order (Doc. #30 ). ORDER granting #27 Joint Motion for Extension of Discovery. SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 9/6/2019 02:00 PM in (VJC), Springfield before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. Discovery due by 9/30/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 10/30/2019. Initial Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 3/5/2020 10:30 AM Chambers before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. Final Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 4/2/2020 10:30 AM Chambers before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. Jury Trial set for 4/6/2020 08:30 AM in (VJC), Springfield before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. Signed on 5/29/2019 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Stout, Courtney) Modified on 6/13/2019 (Wheeler, LaTandra). (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Joint MOTION for extension of time to complete discovery filed by Plaintiff and filed by David S. Baker on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/12/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Baker, David) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tammy Arnold, Barry County, Missouri, Bud Bland, Naomi Daniel, Gary Davis, Mick Epperly, Michael Gallahue, Nick Hill, Michael Lane, Jim Smith for Barry County's Responses to 1st ROGS & 1st RFP and remaining Defendants Responses to 1st ROGS filed by David S. Baker on behalf of Defendants Tammy Arnold, Barry County, Missouri, Bud Bland, Naomi Daniel, Gary Davis, Mick Epperly, Michael Gallahue, Nick Hill, Michael Lane, Jim Smith.(Baker, David) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) SUGGESTION OF DEATH as to Jamie Weston by Tammy Arnold, Barry County, Missouri, Bud Bland, Naomi Daniel, Gary Davis, Mick Epperly, Michael Gallahue, Nick Hill, Michael Lane, Jim Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Obituary)(Baker, David) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs First Discovery Requests to Defendants filed by J Andrew Hirth on behalf of Plaintiff Martin Dale Davis.(Hirth, J Andrew) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) This Order has been amended. Please refer to the Third Amended Scheduling Order (Doc. #30 ). FIRST AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER:Status Conference set for 6/7/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, Springfield (VJC) before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. Discovery due by 7/2/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 8/1/2019. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/6/2019 01:00 PM Courtroom 2, Springfield (VJC) before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/3/2020 01:00 PM in Courtroom 2, Springfield (VJC) before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. Jury Trial set for 1/6/2020 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Springfield (VJC) before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. The Court further ORDERS Plaintiff to serve a copy of this Order on all Defendants who have not yet been served with process if and when process is served.Signed on 12/28/2018 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Phillips, Caleb) Modified on 5/31/2019 (Wheeler, LaTandra). Modified on 6/13/2019 (Wheeler, LaTandra). (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) This Order has been amended. Please refer to Amended Scheduling Order (Doc. #10 ) SCHEDULING ORDER:Status Conference set for 6/3/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom 8E, Kansas City (RK) before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. Discovery due by 7/2/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 8/1/2019. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/5/2019 10:30 AM Courtroom 8E, Kansas City (RK) before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/2/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom 8E, Kansas City (RK) before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. Jury Trial set for 1/6/2020 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8E, Kansas City (RK) before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark.The Court further ORDERS Plaintiff to serve a copy of this Order on all Defendants who have not yet been served with process if and when process is served.Signed on 12/21/2018 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Phillips, Caleb) Modified on 1/2/2019 (Wheeler, LaTandra). (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Plaintiff and by Barry County, Missouri. (Baker, David) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint on behalf of Barry County, Missouri.(Baker, David) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by J Andrew Hirth on behalf of Martin Dale Davis.(Hirth, J Andrew) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of appearance by J Andrew Hirth on behalf of Martin Dale Davis (Attorney J Andrew Hirth added to party Martin Dale Davis(pty:pla))(Hirth, J Andrew) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 12/20/2018. Proposed scheduling order due by 1/4/2019. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff Martin Dale Davis via regular mail. Signed on 11/20/2018 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Phillips, Caleb) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • (#3) ORDER TRANSFERRING/REASSIGNING CASE. Due to a possible conflict of interest, this case is randomly reassigned to District Judge Roseann Ketchmark for all further proceedings. District Judge M. Douglas Harpool no longer assigned to case. Signed on 11/20/18 by Clerk of Court. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Siegert, Karen) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of filing Notice of Service by Barry County, Missouri (Baker, David) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Barry County County, case number 18BR-CC00091, Barry County, Missouri, Martin Dale Davis. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number BMOWDC-6042963. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Service of Removal to Circuit Court)(Baker, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/19/2018: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Woods, Gloria). (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeannette Lynn Wolpink

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David S. Baker