This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/24/2017 at 02:16:29 (UTC).

Maria Meraz v. Sally Beauty Supply, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/23/2017 Maria Meraz filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Sally Beauty Supply, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Paul L. Abrams and Cormac J. Carney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:17-CV-01091

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Paul L. Abrams

Presiding Judge

Cormac J. Carney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maria Meraz

Defendants

Does 1-10, inclusive

L Oreal USA, Inc

Sally Beauty Supply, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Grant J Hallstrom

Attorney at Hallstrom Klein and Ward LLP

15615 Alton Parkway Suite 175

Irvine, CA 92618

Betty J Levine

Attorney at Hallstrom Klein and Ward LLP

15615 Alton Parkway Suite 175

Irvine, CA 92618

Paul Joseph Kurtzhall

Attorney at Hallstrom Klein and Ward LLP

15615 Alton Parkway Suite 175

Irvine, CA 92618

Defendant Attorneys

Nicole Lomibao

Attorney at Gordon and Rees LLP

633 West Fifth Street 52Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Stephen E Ronk

Attorney at Gordon and Rees LLP

633 West Fifth Street 52Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Erika Lynn Shao

Attorney at Gordon and Rees LLP

633 West 5Th Street 52Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 06/23/2017)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (et) (Entered: 06/23/2017)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant L'Oreal USA S/D, Inc., (Certificate of Service of Notice to State Court and Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court served on 6/23/2017. (Shao, Erika) (Entered: 06/23/2017)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant L'Oreal USA S/D, Inc., (Shao, Erika) (Entered: 06/23/2017)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant L'Oreal USA S/D, Inc.. (Shao, Erika) (Entered: 06/23/2017)

1 #3

L'Oreal Answer to Complaint

1 #2

Complaint

1 #1

Declaration of Erika Shao

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2017-00921772 Receipt No: 0973-20073124 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant L'Oreal USA S/D, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Erika Shao, #2 Complaint, #3 L'Oreal Answer to Complaint) (Attorney Erika Lynn Shao added to party L'Oreal USA S/D, Inc.(pty:dft))(Shao, Erika) (Entered: 06/23/2017)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 06/23/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (et) (Entered: 06/23/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant L Oreal USA, Inc. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/22/2017 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT #3](et) (Entered: 06/23/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants L Oreal USA, Inc, Sally Beauty Supply, LLC., Does 1-10, inclusive, filed by Plaintiff Maria Meraz. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/22/2017 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT #2] (et) (Entered: 06/23/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant L'Oreal USA S/D, Inc., (Certificate of Service of Notice to State Court and Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court served on 6/23/2017. (Shao, Erika) (Entered: 06/23/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant L'Oreal USA S/D, Inc., (Shao, Erika) (Entered: 06/23/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant L'Oreal USA S/D, Inc.. (Shao, Erika) (Entered: 06/23/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2017-00921772 Receipt No: 0973-20073124 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant L'Oreal USA S/D, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Erika Shao, #2 Complaint, #3 L'Oreal Answer to Complaint) (Attorney Erika Lynn Shao added to party L'Oreal USA S/D, Inc.(pty:dft))(Shao, Erika) (Entered: 06/23/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where L Oreal USA, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Sally Beauty Supply LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul J. Kurtzhall