This case was last updated from PACER on 10/24/2014 at 12:02:34 (UTC).

Marez et al v. KHG of San Antonio, L.L.C. d/b/a Tiffany's Cabaret et al

Case Summary

On 07/01/2014 Marez filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against KHG of San Antonio, L L C d/b/a Tiffany's Cabaret. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Orlando L. Garcia and Henry J. Bemporad. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:14-CV-00585

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Orlando L. Garcia

Referral Judge

Henry J. Bemporad

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Melissa Archer

Veronica Ayala

Houston, TX 77046

Yamika Baez

Elizabeth Boglin

Dolores DelaFuente

Amanda Garcia

Melissa Rose Hernandez

Debra Ann Hernandez-Quiles

Stephanie Lanier

Samantha Marez

Houston, TX 77046

Charlene Modine

Erica Morales Salib

Nicky Nay

Grace Ramos

Rosa M. Rivera

Amelia Salinas

Rose A. Stewart

Jocabed Valdez

Erica Zamora

Defendant

E&I Enterprises, Inc.

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ricardo Jose Prieto

Attorney at Shellist Lazarz Slobin LLP

11 Greenway Plaza, Suite 1515

Houston, TX 77046

Martin A. Shellist

Attorney at Shellist Lazarz Slobin LLP

11 Greenway Plaza - Ste 1515

Houston, TX 77046

Defendant Attorneys

Dean R. Fuchs

Attorney at Schulten Ward & Turner, LLP

260 Peachtree Street, Nw, Suite 2700

Atlanta, GA 30303

Lilia S. Marek

Attorney at Rougeux & Associates PLLC

595 S. Castell

New Braunfels, TX 78130

Natalie C. Rougeux

Attorney at Rougeux & Associates

595 S. Castell

New Braunfels, TX 78130

W. Scott Schulten

Attorney at Schulten Ward & Turner, LLP

260 Peachtree Street, Nw, Suite 2700

Atlanta, GA 30303

Other Attorneys

John A. Christy

Attorney at Schreeder, Wheeler & Flint, LLP

1100 Peachtree St., N.E. - Ste 800

Atlanta, GA 30309

Michael Lamoine Holland

Attorney at Holland & Holland L.L.C.

1250 Ne Loop 410 - Suite 808

San Antonio, TX 78209

Andrew J. Lavoie

Attorney at Schreeder, Wheeler & Flint, LLP

1100 Peachtree St., N.E. - Ste 800

Atlanta, GA 30309

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Original Collective Action ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-6623000). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Veronica Ayala, Samantha Marez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A (Marez Consent), #2 Exhibit Ex. B (Ayala Consent), #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shellist, Martin) (Entered: 07/01/2014)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Ex. A (Marez Consent)

1 #2

Exhibit Ex. B (Ayala Consent)

2 #12

Exhibit Ex. N (Boglin Consent)

2 #10

Exhibit Ex. L (Zamora Consent)

2 #8

Exhibit Ex. J (Salinas Consent)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Filing Additional Notices of Consent by Veronica Ayala, Samantha Marez (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. C (Archer Consent), #2 Exhibit Ex. D (Baez Consent), #3 Exhibit Ex. E (DelaFuente Consent), #4 Exhibit Ex. F (Hernandez/Quiles Consent), #5 Exhibit Ex. G (Lanier Consent), #6 Exhibit Ex. H (Modine Consent), #7 Exhibit Ex. I (Nay Consent), #8 Exhibit Ex. J (Salinas Consent), #9 Exhibit Ex. K (Ramos Consent), #10 Exhibit Ex. L (Zamora Consent), #11 Exhibit Ex. M (Salib Consent), #12 Exhibit Ex. N (Boglin Consent))(Prieto, Ricardo) (Entered: 07/01/2014)

2 #9

Exhibit Ex. K (Ramos Consent)

#70

(#70) NOTICE of Filing Plaintiffs' October 21, 2014 Notice of Filing Additional Notice of Consent of Rose Stewart by Samantha Marez (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Prieto, Ricardo) (Entered: 10/21/2014)

70 #1

Exhibit

67 #1

Proposed Order

#69

(#69) ORDER GRANTING #67 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Defendants shall file their response to Plaintiffs' Motion no later than October 29, 2014. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (aej) (Entered: 10/17/2014)

#67

(#67) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #66 Opposed MOTION to Certify Class (Conditional Certification) of a Collective Action and Authorization for Notice by E&I Enterprises, Inc., Tim Eidson, Mike Fulton, Russell Ingram, KHG of San Antonio, L.L.C., M.R.G. Enterprises, Inc., Robert O'Hayon, Rick Peffer, Phillip G Phifer, R. Neck Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (Fuchs, Dean) (Entered: 10/16/2014)

66 #1

Exhibit A - Declaration of S. Marez

66 #7

Proposed Order

66 #6

Exhibit F - Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff

66 #5

Exhibit E - Consent to Join Lawsuit

124 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#70) NOTICE of Filing Plaintiffs' October 21, 2014 Notice of Filing Additional Notice of Consent of Rose Stewart by Samantha Marez (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Prieto, Ricardo) (Entered: 10/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#69) ORDER GRANTING #67 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Defendants shall file their response to Plaintiffs' Motion no later than October 29, 2014. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (aej) (Entered: 10/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#67) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #66 Opposed MOTION to Certify Class (Conditional Certification) of a Collective Action and Authorization for Notice by E&I Enterprises, Inc., Tim Eidson, Mike Fulton, Russell Ingram, KHG of San Antonio, L.L.C., M.R.G. Enterprises, Inc., Robert O'Hayon, Rick Peffer, Phillip G Phifer, R. Neck Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (Fuchs, Dean) (Entered: 10/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#68) ORDER GRANTING #65 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (aej) (Entered: 10/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#66) Opposed MOTION to Certify Class (Conditional Certification) of a Collective Action and Authorization for Notice by Samantha Marez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of S. Marez, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of D. Delafuente, #3 Exhibit C - Deposition of J Condrin, #4 Exhibit D - Notification of Potential Class Members, #5 Exhibit E - Consent to Join Lawsuit, #6 Exhibit F - Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff, #7 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (Prieto, Ricardo) (Entered: 10/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#65) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation in their Motion for Conditional Certification of a Collective Action and Authorization for Notice by Samantha Marez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (Prieto, Ricardo) (Entered: 10/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#64) ORDER, ( Status Conference set for 10/31/2014 10:00 AM before Judge Henry J. Bemporad,). Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (aej) (Entered: 10/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#63) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by KHG of San Antonio, L.L.C. corrected re: Declaration of Jonathan Pullin (Fuchs, Dean) (Entered: 10/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#62) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by KHG of San Antonio, L.L.C. Corrected re: Declaration of Joseph Hartle (Fuchs, Dean) (Entered: 10/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#61) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by KHG of San Antonio, L.L.C. re: Declaration of James Condrin (Fuchs, Dean) (Entered: 10/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Rick Peffer on 7/1/2014 by Veronica Ayala, Samantha Marez (Prieto, Ricardo) (Entered: 07/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to E&I Enterprise, Inc. on 7/1/2014 by Veronica Ayala, Samantha Marez (Prieto, Ricardo) (Entered: 07/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to M.R.G. Enterprises, Inc. on 7/1/2014 by Veronica Ayala, Samantha Marez (Prieto, Ricardo) (Entered: 07/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to R. Neck Enterprises, Inc. on 7/1/2014 by Veronica Ayala, Samantha Marez (Prieto, Ricardo) (Entered: 07/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Tim Eidson on 7/1/2014 by Veronica Ayala, Samantha Marez (Prieto, Ricardo) (Entered: 07/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to KHG of San Antonio, L.L.C. d/b/a Tiffany's Cabaret on 7/1/2014 by Veronica Ayala, Samantha Marez (Prieto, Ricardo) (Entered: 07/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Filing Additional Notices of Consent by Veronica Ayala, Samantha Marez (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. C (Archer Consent), #2 Exhibit Ex. D (Baez Consent), #3 Exhibit Ex. E (DelaFuente Consent), #4 Exhibit Ex. F (Hernandez/Quiles Consent), #5 Exhibit Ex. G (Lanier Consent), #6 Exhibit Ex. H (Modine Consent), #7 Exhibit Ex. I (Nay Consent), #8 Exhibit Ex. J (Salinas Consent), #9 Exhibit Ex. K (Ramos Consent), #10 Exhibit Ex. L (Zamora Consent), #11 Exhibit Ex. M (Salib Consent), #12 Exhibit Ex. N (Boglin Consent))(Prieto, Ricardo) (Entered: 07/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (aej) (Entered: 07/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • Case Assigned to Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (aej) (Entered: 07/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Original Collective Action ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-6623000). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Veronica Ayala, Samantha Marez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A (Marez Consent), #2 Exhibit Ex. B (Ayala Consent), #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shellist, Martin) (Entered: 07/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.