This case was last updated from PACER on 04/06/2018 at 00:23:22 (UTC).

Maquet Cardiovascular LLC v. Saphena Medical, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/16/2016 Maquet Cardiovascular LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Saphena Medical, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William Alsup. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:16-CV-07213

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William Alsup

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maquet Cardiovascular LLC

Defendants

Albert Chin

Saphena Medical, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Xavier Mark Brandwajn(Designation Retained)

Christopher Charles Ziegler

Michael S. Connor(Designation Retained)

Christopher C. Zeigler(Designation Retained)

Defendant Attorneys

Margaret E Ives

Karen I. Boyd

 

Court Documents

#176

(#176) ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO ATTEND FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on January 3, 2018. (jsclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2018)

#175

(#175) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/26/2017. Show Cause Response due by 1/4/2018. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2017)

#153

(#153) ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY HEARING [re 152 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Albert Chin, Saphena Medical, Inc.]. Response due by NOON on 8/21/2017. Three-hour meet-and-confer from 8:00 AM--11:00 AM 8/23/2017 in Court's jury room on the 19th floor. Discovery Hearing set for 8/23/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/17/2017. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2017)

#141

(#141) ORDER RE 86 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM AND 63 MOTION TO STAY, SEVER, OR BIFURCATE (granting 137 ). Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/27/2017. Amended Pleadings due by 8/3/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2017)

#96

(#96) ORDER (1) GRANTING 87 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM FILING DEADLINE AND (2) SETTING 86 BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/14/2017. Responses due by 6/22/2017. Replies due by 6/29/2017. Motion Hearing set for 7/13/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2017)

#82

(#82) ORDER GRANTING 62 MOTION TO DISMISS AND HOLDING IN ABEYANCE 63 MOTION TO STAY COUNTERCLAIM by Judge Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2017)

#75

(#75) SECOND NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/16/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2017)

#74

(#74) NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/9/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2017)

#42

(#42) ORDER GRANTING 41 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY VANESSA ARSLANIAN PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2017)

#40

(#40) ORDER GRANTING 37 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY WILLIAM UNSWORTH PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2017)

#38

(#38) ORDER GRANTING 34 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY MICHAEL BUNIS PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2017)

#33

(#33) ORDER GRANTING 32 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PAUL POPEO PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017)

#31

(#31) ORDER DENYING 29 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017)

#27

(#27) ORDER GRANTING 25 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY CHRISTOPHER ZIEGLER PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017)

#23

(#23) ORDER DENYING 21 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2017)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#176) ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO ATTEND FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on January 3, 2018. (jsclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#175) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/26/2017. Show Cause Response due by 1/4/2018. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#153) ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY HEARING [re 152 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Albert Chin, Saphena Medical, Inc.]. Response due by NOON on 8/21/2017. Three-hour meet-and-confer from 8:00 AM--11:00 AM 8/23/2017 in Court's jury room on the 19th floor. Discovery Hearing set for 8/23/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/17/2017. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#141) ORDER RE 86 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM AND 63 MOTION TO STAY, SEVER, OR BIFURCATE (granting 137 ). Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/27/2017. Amended Pleadings due by 8/3/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#96) ORDER (1) GRANTING 87 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM FILING DEADLINE AND (2) SETTING 86 BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/14/2017. Responses due by 6/22/2017. Replies due by 6/29/2017. Motion Hearing set for 7/13/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#82) ORDER GRANTING 62 MOTION TO DISMISS AND HOLDING IN ABEYANCE 63 MOTION TO STAY COUNTERCLAIM by Judge Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#75) SECOND NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/16/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#74) NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/9/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) ORDER GRANTING 41 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY VANESSA ARSLANIAN PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) ORDER GRANTING 37 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY WILLIAM UNSWORTH PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) ORDER GRANTING 34 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY MICHAEL BUNIS PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) ORDER GRANTING 32 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PAUL POPEO PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) ORDER DENYING 29 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) ORDER GRANTING 25 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY CHRISTOPHER ZIEGLER PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ORDER DENYING 21 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Xavier M. Brandwajn Esquire

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael S. Connor