This case was last updated from PACER on 06/10/2018 at 07:02:59 (UTC).

Mantissa Corporation v. Great American Bancorp Inc et al

Case Summary

On 04/11/2018 Mantissa Corporation filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Great American Bancorp Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Colin Stirling Bruce and Eric I. Long. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02103

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colin Stirling Bruce

Referral Judge

Eric I. Long

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mantissa Corporation

Defendants

First Federal Savings Bank of Champaign-Urbana

Great American Bancorp Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nicholas A Kurk

Attorney at YOUNG BASILE HANLON & MACFARLANE PC

Suite 1450, 150 N Wacker Dr

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant Attorneys

Jamie S Ritchie

Attorney at KRAUSKOPF KAUFFMAN PC

Suite 210, 414 North Orleans Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Howard Schusteff

Attorney at KRAUSKOPF KAUFFMAN PC

Suite 100, 655 Deerfield Road

Deerfield, IL 60015

Stuart P Krauskopf

Attorney at KRAUSKOPF KAUFFMAN PC

Suite 210, 414 North Orleans Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Ryan R Smith

Attorney at WILSON SONSINI GOODRICH & ROSATI

650 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Ryan Smith

Attorney at WILSON SONSINI GOODRICH & ROSATI

650 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304

 

Court Documents

34 #1

Exhibit 1

#34

(#34) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #21 Plaintiff's Supplement to Opposition to Motion to Stay Pending Resolution of Manufacturer Case filed by Plaintiff Mantissa Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kurk, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/06/2018)

#32

(#32) Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:17-cv-09171. . (Entered: 04/11/2018)

21 #2

Exhibit Declaration of Todd Lesher

21 #1

Exhibit Declaration of Ryan Smith

#21

(#34) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #21 Plaintiff's Supplement to Opposition to Motion to Stay Pending Resolution of Manufacturer Case filed by Plaintiff Mantissa Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kurk, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/06/2018)

#7

**STRICKEN**TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 4/16/2018. This Court has reviewed the parties' Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting #7 and pursuant to the Order #6 scheduling this matter for a Rule 16 hearing conference by personal appearance on 5/2/18 at 10:45 AM, the matter is hereby converted from personal appearance to telephone conference on the same date at the same time. The Court will initiate the call. (DS, ilcd) Modified on 4/16/2018 to show text order stricken (DS, ilcd). (Entered: 04/16/2018)

#6

**STRICKEN**TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 4/16/2018. This Court has reviewed the parties' Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting #7 and pursuant to the Order #6 scheduling this matter for a Rule 16 hearing conference by personal appearance on 5/2/18 at 10:45 AM, the matter is hereby converted from personal appearance to telephone conference on the same date at the same time. The Court will initiate the call. (DS, ilcd) Modified on 4/16/2018 to show text order stricken (DS, ilcd). (Entered: 04/16/2018)

#5

(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial status hearing is set for 2/20/2018 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the courts action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least two days prior to the initial status. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 12/27/2017)

#4

(#4) MAILED patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (eaa, ) (Entered: 12/21/2017)

#3

(#3) LOCAL RULE 3.4 NOTICE OF CLAIMS INVOLVING PATENT by Mantissa Corporation (Kurk, Nicholas) (Docket Text Modified on 12/21/2017 by Clerk's Office) (eaa, ). (Entered: 12/20/2017)

#2

(#2) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Mantissa Corporation (Kurk, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/20/2017)

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed by Mantissa Corporation; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-13934615. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Kurk, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/20/2017)

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #21 Plaintiff's Supplement to Opposition to Motion to Stay Pending Resolution of Manufacturer Case filed by Plaintiff Mantissa Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kurk, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Minute entry for proceedings held 5/30/18 before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. Appearance on behalf of plaintiff by Nicholas Kurk and John DeMarco. Appearance on behalf of defendant by Ryan Smith and Anjuli Nanda. Status hearing held by phone. Status of the case discussed. Defendants renewed their motion in ND/IL. Plaintiff adopted the opposition and reply. Plaintiff given 7 days to supplement their opposition. Defendant given 7 days thereafter to supplement their reply. (Tape #UR-B 11:17 AM.) (DS, ilcd) (Entered: 05/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER STRIKING DOCUMENT entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 4/17/2018. Remark #33 is STRICKEN as it was filed in the incorrect case. (DS, ilcd) (Entered: 04/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) **STRICKEN**Remark: Notice of MDL Case #2843. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (DS, ilcd) Modified on 4/17/2018 to show stricken (DS, ilcd). (Entered: 04/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • TEXT ORDER STRIKING the Text Order entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 4/16/2018. This was entered in the incorrect case.(DS, ilcd) (Entered: 04/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • **STRICKEN**TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 4/16/2018. This Court has reviewed the parties' Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting #7 and pursuant to the Order #6 scheduling this matter for a Rule 16 hearing conference by personal appearance on 5/2/18 at 10:45 AM, the matter is hereby converted from personal appearance to telephone conference on the same date at the same time. The Court will initiate the call. (DS, ilcd) Modified on 4/16/2018 to show text order stricken (DS, ilcd). (Entered: 04/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference is set for 5/30/2018 at 11:15 AM by telephone from Urbana (court will place call) before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. (DS, ilcd) (Entered: 04/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 4/12/2018. At the request of the Court, this case is scheduled for a Status Conference on May 30, 2018, at 11:15 A.M. by telephone from Urbana (Court will place call) before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. (DS, ilcd) (Entered: 04/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:17-cv-09171. . (Entered: 04/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) TRANSFERRED to the USDC Central District of Illinois - Urban Division the electronic record. (eaa, ) (Entered: 04/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION by Plaintiff Mantissa Corporation for extension of time to file answer Unopposed Motion for Extension for Defendants to Answer the Complaint or Otherwise Plead (Kurk, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mantissa Corporation as to Great American Bancorp, Inc. on 12/21/2017, answer due 1/11/2018. (Kurk, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mantissa Corporation as to First Federal Savings Bank of Champaign-Urbana on 12/21/2017, answer due 1/11/2018. (Kurk, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial status hearing is set for 2/20/2018 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the courts action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least two days prior to the initial status. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 12/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants First Federal Savings Bank of Champaign-Urbana, Great American Bancorp, Inc. (kms) (Entered: 12/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MAILED patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (eaa, ) (Entered: 12/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila Finnegan. (meg, ) (Entered: 12/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) LOCAL RULE 3.4 NOTICE OF CLAIMS INVOLVING PATENT by Mantissa Corporation (Kurk, Nicholas) (Docket Text Modified on 12/21/2017 by Clerk's Office) (eaa, ). (Entered: 12/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Mantissa Corporation (Kurk, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed by Mantissa Corporation; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-13934615. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Kurk, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less