This case was last updated from PACER on 11/04/2018 at 07:32:25 (UTC).

Mann v. Graebner et al

Case Summary

On 09/05/2018 Mann filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Graebner. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Martin Reidinger, Dennis Howell and W. Carleton Metcalf. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00250

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Martin Reidinger

Referral Judges

Dennis Howell

W. Carleton Metcalf

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chad Allen Mann

Defendants

James Paul Graebner

Givens Transportation, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mark Russell Melrose

Attorney at Melrose Law, PLLC

P.O. Box 567

Waynesville, NC 28786

Defendant Attorney

Austin Ryan Walsh

Attorney at Hedrick Gardner Kincheloe & Garofalo

P.O. Box 30397

Charlotte, NC 28210

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to James Paul Graebner and Givens Transportation, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Givens Transportation, Inc.)(emw) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

2 #1

Givens Transportation, Inc.

#4

(#4) MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Givens Transportation, Inc.. (Walsh, Austin). Motions referred to Dennis Howell. (Entered: 09/27/2018)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting Defendant Givens' #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Givens has up to and including November 10, 2018, within which to file an answer or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 9/28/2018. (khm) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Chad Allen Mann. Givens Transportation, Inc. served on 9/20/2018, answer due 11/10/2018. (Melrose, Mark) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chad Allen Mann (Melrose, Mark) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3798909), filed by Chad Allen Mann.(Melrose, Mark) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2018
  • Case referral reassigned to Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell no longer assigned to the case. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(nvc) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Chad Allen Mann. Givens Transportation, Inc. served on 9/20/2018, answer due 11/10/2018. (Melrose, Mark) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting Defendant Givens' #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Givens has up to and including November 10, 2018, within which to file an answer or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 9/28/2018. (khm) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Givens Transportation, Inc.. (Walsh, Austin). Motions referred to Dennis Howell. (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chad Allen Mann (Melrose, Mark) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to James Paul Graebner and Givens Transportation, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Givens Transportation, Inc.)(emw) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Case assigned to District Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(emw) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3798909), filed by Chad Allen Mann.(Melrose, Mark) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less