This case was last updated from PACER on 01/06/2019 at 07:31:15 (UTC).

Manistee Lakeview Tenants Association et al v. Stechschulte et al

Case Summary

On 11/07/2018 Manistee Lakeview Tenants Association filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against Stechschulte. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ray Kent and Paul L. Maloney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01250

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ray Kent

Presiding Judge

Paul L. Maloney

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lois J. Schmeling

Larry Hansen

Aleta Harrell

Dale L. Hansen

Dawn M. Wick

Jean Leatherman

Rain Dove

Joseph A. Gabris

Sandra K. Hilley

Sandra A. Rutherford

Heather L. Green

Bruce H. Paxson

Russell H. Paxson

Manistee Lakeview Tenants Association

Linda F. Spahn

Doris M. Newland

Defendants

William Stechschulte

Sonny Perdue

Joel Baxley

Jason Allen

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jennifer R. Gray

Attorney at Legal Services of Northern Michigan Inc. (Traverse City)

221 Garland St., Ste. H

Traverse City, MI 49684

Defendant Attorneys

Benjamin Cameron Dilley

Attorney at Mika Meyers Beckett & Jones PLC

900 Monroe Ave., Nw

Grand Rapids, MI 49503

Richard M. Wilson, Jr.

Attorney at Mika Meyers PLC

414 Water St.

Manistee, MI 49660

Jeanne Frances Long

Attorney at U.S. Attorney (Grand Rapids)

The Law Bldg., 330 Ionia Ave., Nw, P.O. Box 208

Grand Rapids, MI 49501-0208

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 #19 Government Defendants' Unopposed Motion For An Extension of Time in Which To Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint in Light of Lapse of Appropriations AND Proposed Order filed by Jason Allen, Joel Baxley, Sonny Perdue (Long, Jeanne) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

19 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order for a 60-day Extension of Time to Respond to Plain

#19

(#19) MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 by defendants Jason Allen, Joel Baxley, Sonny Perdue; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order for a 60-day Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint) (Long, Jeanne) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

#18

(#18) ANSWER to complaint, #1 with affirmative defenses by William Stechschulte (Dilley, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

#17

(#17) MINUTES of motion hearing re #4 MOTION for preliminary injunction filed by Dale L. Hansen, Joseph A. Gabris, Sandra A. Rutherford, Doris M. Newland, Tana L. Baker, Jean Leatherman, Heather L. Green, Sandra K. Hilley, Rain Dove, Russell H. Paxson, Bruce H. Paxson, Dawn M. Wick, Larry Hansen, Aleta Harrell, Linda F. Spahn, Manistee Lakeview Tenants Association, Lois J. Schmeling; TRO extended through 1/24/2019; held before District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Court Reporter: Kathleen Thomas) (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

#16

(#16) ORDER extending Temporary Restraining Order through 1/24/2019; joint status report to be filed by 1/10/2019; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

15 #6

Exhibit 6

15 #5

Exhibit 5

#15

(#15) RESPONSE TO MOTION for temporary restraining order preliminary injunction #4 filed by William Stechschulte (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10) (Dilley, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

1 #15

Exhibit Exhibit O

1 #14

Exhibit Exhibit N

1 #11

Exhibit Exhibit K

1 #10

Exhibit Exhibit J

1 #9

Exhibit Exhibit I

1 #8

Exhibit Exhibit H

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 #19 Government Defendants' Unopposed Motion For An Extension of Time in Which To Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint in Light of Lapse of Appropriations AND Proposed Order filed by Jason Allen, Joel Baxley, Sonny Perdue (Long, Jeanne) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 by defendants Jason Allen, Joel Baxley, Sonny Perdue; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order for a 60-day Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint) (Long, Jeanne) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ANSWER to complaint, #1 with affirmative defenses by William Stechschulte (Dilley, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MINUTES of motion hearing re #4 MOTION for preliminary injunction filed by Dale L. Hansen, Joseph A. Gabris, Sandra A. Rutherford, Doris M. Newland, Tana L. Baker, Jean Leatherman, Heather L. Green, Sandra K. Hilley, Rain Dove, Russell H. Paxson, Bruce H. Paxson, Dawn M. Wick, Larry Hansen, Aleta Harrell, Linda F. Spahn, Manistee Lakeview Tenants Association, Lois J. Schmeling; TRO extended through 1/24/2019; held before District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Court Reporter: Kathleen Thomas) (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER extending Temporary Restraining Order through 1/24/2019; joint status report to be filed by 1/10/2019; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) RESPONSE TO MOTION for temporary restraining order preliminary injunction #4 filed by William Stechschulte (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10) (Dilley, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Richard M. Wilson, Jr on behalf of defendant William Stechschulte (Wilson, Richard) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER approving STIPULATION in part #13 ; hearing on motion for preliminary injunction adjourned to 12/13/2018 at 10:00 a.m.; Defendant Stechschulte's response to motion due by 5:00 p.m. on 12/10/2018; the TRO remains in full force and effect; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Benjamin Cameron Dilley on behalf of defendant William Stechschulte (Dilley, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Adjourning Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Extending Response Deadline by defendant William Stechschulte [Attorney Benjamin Cameron Dilley added to party William Stechschulte(pty:dft)] (Dilley, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; hearing on motion for preliminary injunction scheduled for 11/15/2018 at 2:00 p.m.; Plaintiffs shall serve Defendant Stechschulte with a copy of this order no later than 11/9/2018 at 5:00 p.m.; Defendants response to motion due by 11/13/2018 st 12:00 p.m.; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Jason Allen, Joel Baxley, Sonny Perdue, William Stechschulte (ns) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (ns) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for temporary restraining order preliminary injunction by plaintiffs Tana L. Baker, Rain Dove, Joseph A. Gabris, Heather L. Green, Dale L. Hansen, Larry Hansen, Aleta Harrell, Sandra K. Hilley, Jean Leatherman, Manistee Lakeview Tenants Association, Doris M. Newland, Bruce H. Paxson, Russell H. Paxson, Sandra A. Rutherford, Lois J. Schmeling, Linda F. Spahn, Dawn M. Wick; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A. Declaration of JRG, #3 Exhibit B. new leases, #4 Exhibit C. RD Letter to Tenants, #5 Exhibit D. Restrictive Use Agreement, #6 Exhibit E. CIRA Needs Analysis) (Gray, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Manistee Lakeview Apartments Tenants Association (Gray, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jennifer R. Gray on behalf of plaintiffs Rain Dove, Joseph A. Gabris, Heather Lee Green, Dale L. Hansen, Larry L. Hansen, Aleta M. Harrell, Sandra K. Hilley, Jean E. Leatherman, Doris M. Newland, Bruce H. Paxson, Russell H. Paxson, Sandra A. Rutherford, Lois J. Schmeling, Linda F. Spahn, Dawn M. Wick (Gray, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jennifer R. Gray on behalf of plaintiff Tana Lynn Baker (Gray, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Gray, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Manistee Lakeview Apartments Tenants Association in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4285478 (Gray, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Manistee Lakeview Apartments Tenants Association (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P) (Gray, Jennifer) Modified text on 11/8/2018 (ns). (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less