This case was last updated from PACER on 11/24/2018 at 07:54:11 (UTC).

Malone et al v. Weyer et al

Case Summary

On 09/25/2018 Malone filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Weyer. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Regina S. Edwards and David J. Hale. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00638

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Regina S. Edwards

Presiding Judge

David J. Hale

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Larry Jordan

Natalie Malone

Defendants

Benjamin Dean

Louisville/Jefferson County Metro Government

Joseph Fox

Kody Despain

Joshua Weyer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brandon J. Lawrence

101 N. Seventh Street, Suite 206

Louisville, KY 40202

Defendant Attorneys

Annale Renneker Taylor

Attorney at Jefferson County Attorney

531 Court Place, Suite 900

Louisville, KY 40202

Annale E. Renneker

Attorney at Jefferson County Attorney

531 Court Place, Suite 900

Louisville, KY 40202

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Remand filed by Benjamin Dean, Kody Despain, Joseph Fox, Louisville/Jefferson County Metro Government, Joshua Weyer. (Taylor, Annale) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

#12

(#12) ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 11/5/2018 granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply: Defendant's Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion #6 to Dismiss be filed no later than seven (7) days following the entry of the Court's Order denying Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, if one is so entered. cc: Counsel (JM) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

#11

(#11) REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #7 Response to Motion filed by Louisville/Jefferson County Metro Government. (Taylor, Annale) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

(#10) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #7 Response to Motion by Defendant Louisville/Jefferson County Metro Government (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Taylor, Annale) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

9 #4

Memorandum in Support

9 #3

Exhibit Bruce Warrick v. Lou. Metro Govt.

9 #2

Exhibit Plaintiffs' Complaint

9 #1

Proposed Order Order to Remand

#9

(#9) MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff Larry Jordan (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order to Remand, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Complaint, #3 Exhibit Bruce Warrick v. Lou. Metro Govt.) (Lawrence, Brandon) (Main Document 9 replaced on 10/19/2018) (DAK). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/19/2018: #4 Memorandum in Support) (DAK). (Entered: 10/18/2018)

8 #2

Exhibit Bruce Warrick v. Lou. Metro Govt. Complaint

8 #1

Exhibit Plaintiff's Complaint

#8

(#8) MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff Larry Jordan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit Bruce Warrick v. Lou. Metro Govt. Complaint) (Lawrence, Brandon) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

7 #1

Proposed Order Order to Remand

#7

(#7) RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Larry Jordan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order to Remand) (Lawrence, Brandon) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

6 #2

Proposed Order

6 #1

Memorandum in Support

#6

(#6) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Louisville/Jefferson County Metro Government (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Renneker, Annale) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Remand filed by Benjamin Dean, Kody Despain, Joseph Fox, Louisville/Jefferson County Metro Government, Joshua Weyer. (Taylor, Annale) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 11/5/2018 granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply: Defendant's Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion #6 to Dismiss be filed no later than seven (7) days following the entry of the Court's Order denying Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, if one is so entered. cc: Counsel (JM) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #7 Response to Motion filed by Louisville/Jefferson County Metro Government. (Taylor, Annale) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #7 Response to Motion by Defendant Louisville/Jefferson County Metro Government (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Taylor, Annale) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff Larry Jordan (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order to Remand, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Complaint, #3 Exhibit Bruce Warrick v. Lou. Metro Govt.) (Lawrence, Brandon) (Main Document 9 replaced on 10/19/2018) (DAK). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/19/2018: #4 Memorandum in Support) (DAK). (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff Larry Jordan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit Bruce Warrick v. Lou. Metro Govt. Complaint) (Lawrence, Brandon) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Larry Jordan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order to Remand) (Lawrence, Brandon) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Louisville/Jefferson County Metro Government (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Renneker, Annale) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Benjamin Dean, Kody Despain, Joseph Fox, Joshua Weyer. (Renneker, Annale) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • (#4) TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 9/26/2018; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Edwards is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CLERK'S NOTICE LETTER sent to Jefferson Circuit Court, Case Number 18-CI-005400, re #1 Notice of Removal. (VS) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. Magistrate Judge designation: Judge Colin H. Lindsay. (VS) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Louisville/Jefferson County Metro Government from Jefferson Circuit Court, Case Number 18-CI-005400, filed by Louisville/Jefferson County Metro Government. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0644-2723479). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit 2 - Copy of Original Complaint, #3 Cover Sheet). (VS) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less