This case was last updated from PACER on 11/20/2018 at 07:08:29 (UTC).

Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 99.32.24.72

Case Summary

On 09/21/2018 Malibu Media, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 99 32 24 72. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert W. Gettleman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-06453

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert W. Gettleman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Malibu Media, LLC

Defendant

John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 72

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mary K. Schulz

Attorney at Media Litigation Firm, P.C.

1144 E. State Street, Suite A260

Geneva, IL 60134

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Motion by Mary K. Schulz for presentment of motion for leave to serve third party subpoenas prior to a Rule(f) conference #4 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/16/2018 at 09:15 AM. (Schulz, Mary) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 9/25/2018 (jh, ). (Entered: 09/24/2018)

5 #2

Exhibit B

#7

(#7) MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (Attachments: #1 List of copyrights) (ph, ) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Malibu Media, LLC (Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

#5

(#5) MEMORANDUM by Malibu Media, LLC in support of motion for leave to serve a third party subpoena prior to a Rule 26(f) conference #4 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schulz, Mary) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 9/25/2018 (jh, ). (Entered: 09/24/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Malibu Media, LLC; jury demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14977452. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLC by Mary K. Schulz (Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

1 #1

Exhibit A

5 #3

Exhibit C

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

7 #1

List of copyrights

#4

(#4) MOTION by Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLCto serve a third party subpoena prior to a Rule 26(f) conference (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order

5 #1

Exhibit A

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Plaintiff's motion #4 for leave to serve a third party subpoena prior to a Rule 26(f) conference is granted. Mailed notice (cn). (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (Attachments: #1 List of copyrights) (ph, ) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Motion by Mary K. Schulz for presentment of motion for leave to serve third party subpoenas prior to a Rule(f) conference #4 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/16/2018 at 09:15 AM. (Schulz, Mary) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 9/25/2018 (jh, ). (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MEMORANDUM by Malibu Media, LLC in support of motion for leave to serve a third party subpoena prior to a Rule 26(f) conference #4 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schulz, Mary) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 9/25/2018 (jh, ). (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION by Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLCto serve a third party subpoena prior to a Rule 26(f) conference (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. (lma, ) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLC by Mary K. Schulz (Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Malibu Media, LLC (Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Malibu Media, LLC; jury demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14977452. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.