This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2018 at 07:07:22 (UTC).

Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 76.29.0.46

Case Summary

On 08/24/2018 Malibu Media, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 76 29 0 46. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Virginia M. Kendall. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-05792

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Virginia M. Kendall

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Malibu Media, LLC

Defendant

John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 76

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mary K. Schulz

Attorney at Media Litigation Firm, P.C.

1144 E. State Street, Suite A260

Geneva, IL 60134

Defendant Attorneys

Jonathan Lucas Allen Phillips

Attorney at Shay Phillips, Ltd.

230 Sw Adams, Suite 310

Peoria, IL 61602

Erin Kathryn Russell

Attorney at The Russell Firm

650 W. Lake Street, #210A

Chicago, IL 60661

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) REPLY by John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 76.29.0.46 to response in opposition to motion, #14 (Russell, Erin) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

14 #3

Exhibit C

#14

(#14) RESPONSE by Malibu Media, LLCin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 76.29.0.46 for reconsideration regarding order on motion for miscellaneous relief,,,,,, terminate deadlines and hearings,,,,,, set deadlines/hearings,,,,, #9 #11 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

14 #2

Exhibit B

14 #1

Exhibit A

#11

(#11) MOTION by Defendant John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 76.29.0.46 for reconsideration regarding order on motion for miscellaneous relief,,,,,, terminate deadlines and hearings,,,,,, set deadlines/hearings,,,,, #9 (Phillips, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

#15

(#15) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Motion hearing held on 10/10/2018. Defendant's Motion for reconsideration of Order granting Third-Party Subpoena prior to Rule 26(f) Conference #11 is taken under advisement. Defendant's oral motion to file a reply is granted. Reply due by 10/17/2018. Ruling will be by mail. Initial Status hearing set for 12/4/2018 is reset 1/10/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#9

(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Plaintiff's Motion to serve a third party subpoena prior to Rule 26(f) conference #6 is granted. Motion hearing set for 9/7/2018 is stricken. Initial status hearing set for 12/4/2018 at 9:00 a.m. Joint Status Report due by 11/29/2018. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

#13

(#13) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 76.29.0.46 by Erin Kathryn Russell (Russell, Erin) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Lucas Allen Phillips for presentment of motion for reconsideration, #11 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 10/10/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Phillips, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

#10

(#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 76.29.0.46 by Jonathan Lucas Allen Phillips (Phillips, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

#6

(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLCto serve a third party subpoena prior to a Rule 26(f) conference (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Motion by Mary K. Schulz for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #6 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 9/7/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

7 #2

Exhibit B

7 #3

Exhibit C

#7

(#7) MEMORANDUM by Malibu Media, LLC in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #6 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

7 #1

Exhibit A

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) REPLY by John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 76.29.0.46 to response in opposition to motion, #14 (Russell, Erin) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Motion hearing held on 10/10/2018. Defendant's Motion for reconsideration of Order granting Third-Party Subpoena prior to Rule 26(f) Conference #11 is taken under advisement. Defendant's oral motion to file a reply is granted. Reply due by 10/17/2018. Ruling will be by mail. Initial Status hearing set for 12/4/2018 is reset 1/10/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) RESPONSE by Malibu Media, LLCin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 76.29.0.46 for reconsideration regarding order on motion for miscellaneous relief,,,,,, terminate deadlines and hearings,,,,,, set deadlines/hearings,,,,, #9 #11 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 76.29.0.46 by Erin Kathryn Russell (Russell, Erin) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Lucas Allen Phillips for presentment of motion for reconsideration, #11 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 10/10/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Phillips, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION by Defendant John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 76.29.0.46 for reconsideration regarding order on motion for miscellaneous relief,,,,,, terminate deadlines and hearings,,,,,, set deadlines/hearings,,,,, #9 (Phillips, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 76.29.0.46 by Jonathan Lucas Allen Phillips (Phillips, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Plaintiff's Motion to serve a third party subpoena prior to Rule 26(f) conference #6 is granted. Motion hearing set for 9/7/2018 is stricken. Initial status hearing set for 12/4/2018 at 9:00 a.m. Joint Status Report due by 11/29/2018. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Motion by Mary K. Schulz for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #6 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 9/7/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEMORANDUM by Malibu Media, LLC in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #6 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLCto serve a third party subpoena prior to a Rule 26(f) conference (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ek, ) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (ek, ) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. (acm) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLC by Mary K. Schulz (Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Malibu Media, LLC (Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Malibu Media, LLC; jury demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14867771. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.