This case was last updated from PACER on 02/22/2019 at 07:02:46 (UTC).

Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe

Case Summary

On 12/24/2018 Malibu Media, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Doe. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Marvin E. Aspen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-08444

  • Filing Date:

    12/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marvin E. Aspen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Malibu Media, LLC

Defendants

John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 69.232.104.52

John Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mary K. Schulz

Attorney at Media Litigation Firm, P.C.

1144 E. State Street, Suite A260

Geneva, IL 60134

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Plaintiff's motion for leave to serve third party subpoena #6 is granted. No appearance is necessary on 1/17/2019. Mailed notice (ags, ) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

4 #1

Copyright Registration

7 #3

Exhibit C

7 #1

Exhibit A

#2

(#2) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Malibu Media, LLC (Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 12/24/2018)

#10

(#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Status hearing set for 2/28/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (ags, ) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Motion by Mary K. Schulz for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #6 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 1/17/2019 at 10:30 AM. (Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A

7 #2

Exhibit B

#7

(#7) MEMORANDUM by Malibu Media, LLC in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #6 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit B

#5

(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Initial status hearing is set for 2/28/2019 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ags, ) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLC by Mary K. Schulz (Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 12/24/2018)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Status hearing set for 2/28/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (ags, ) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Plaintiff's motion for leave to serve third party subpoena #6 is granted. No appearance is necessary on 1/17/2019. Mailed notice (ags, ) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Motion by Mary K. Schulz for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #6 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 1/17/2019 at 10:30 AM. (Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEMORANDUM by Malibu Media, LLC in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #6 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLCfor early discovery (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Initial status hearing is set for 2/28/2019 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ags, ) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, ) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (Attachments: #1 Copyright Registration) (kp, ) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLC by Mary K. Schulz (Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 12/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Malibu Media, LLC (Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 12/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Malibu Media, LLC; jury demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15311475. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 12/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.