This case was last updated from PACER on 01/18/2019 at 07:07:14 (UTC).

Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 24.12.3.231

Case Summary

On 11/19/2018 Malibu Media, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 24 12 3 231. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles R. Norgle, Sr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-07652

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles R. Norgle, Sr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Malibu Media, LLC

Defendant

John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 24.12.3.231

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mary K. Schulz

Attorney at Media Litigation Firm, P.C.

1144 E. State Street, Suite A260

Geneva, IL 60134

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) MOTION by Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLCfor early discovery (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Malibu Media, LLC; jury demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15192274. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

#9

(#9) ORDER on Motion for Leave to Serve Third Party Subpoena prior to Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 12/13/2018. Mailed notice(gcy, ) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

#6

(#6) MEMORANDUM by Malibu Media, LLC in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #5 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLC by Mary K. Schulz (Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

6 #3

Exhibit C

6 #2

Exhibit B

#4

(#4) MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington, DC (bg, ) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#8

(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion for Leave to Serve Third Party Subpoena #5 is granted. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, December 14, 2018. Mailed notice (ewf, ) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

1 #1

Exhibit A

6 #1

Exhibit A

#2

(#2) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Malibu Media, LLC (Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order

1 #2

Exhibit B

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER on Motion for Leave to Serve Third Party Subpoena prior to Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 12/13/2018. Mailed notice(gcy, ) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion for Leave to Serve Third Party Subpoena #5 is granted. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, December 14, 2018. Mailed notice (ewf, ) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Motion by Mary K. Schulz for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #5 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 12/14/2018 at 10:30 AM. (Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MEMORANDUM by Malibu Media, LLC in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #5 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION by Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLCfor early discovery (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington, DC (bg, ) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, ) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLC by Mary K. Schulz (Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Malibu Media, LLC (Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Malibu Media, LLC; jury demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15192274. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.