This case was last updated from PACER on 01/15/2019 at 07:08:18 (UTC).

Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 208.59.132.241

Case Summary

On 11/16/2018 Malibu Media, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 208 59 132 241. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald A. Guzman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-07608

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronald A. Guzman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Malibu Media, LLC

Defendant

John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 208.59.132.241

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mary K. Schulz

Attorney at Media Litigation Firm, P.C.

1144 E. State Street, Suite A260

Geneva, IL 60134

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Malibu Media, LLC (Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLC by Mary K. Schulz (Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (ek, ) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

#7

(#7) MEMORANDUM by Malibu Media, LLC in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #6 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Motion by Mary K. Schulz for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #6 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 12/11/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

#5

(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: The Court orders the parties to appear for an initial status hearing. All parties shall refer to and comply with Judge Guzman's requirements for the initial appearance as outlined in Judge Guzman's case management procedures, which can be found at: www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Initial status hearing set for 1/23/2019 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (is, ) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

7 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Malibu Media, LLC; jury demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15188196. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#6

(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLCfor early discovery (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit B

7 #3

Exhibit C

#9

(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Plaintiff's motion for leave to serve a third party subpoena prior to a Rule 26(f) conference #6 is granted. Motion hearing noticed for 12/11/2018 is stricken and no appearance is necessary. Mailed notice (is, ) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Plaintiff's motion for leave to serve a third party subpoena prior to a Rule 26(f) conference #6 is granted. Motion hearing noticed for 12/11/2018 is stricken and no appearance is necessary. Mailed notice (is, ) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Motion by Mary K. Schulz for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #6 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 12/11/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEMORANDUM by Malibu Media, LLC in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #6 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLCfor early discovery (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: The Court orders the parties to appear for an initial status hearing. All parties shall refer to and comply with Judge Guzman's requirements for the initial appearance as outlined in Judge Guzman's case management procedures, which can be found at: www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Initial status hearing set for 1/23/2019 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (is, ) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, ) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (ek, ) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLC by Mary K. Schulz (Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Malibu Media, LLC (Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Malibu Media, LLC; jury demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15188196. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less