This case was last updated from PACER on 11/20/2018 at 07:06:18 (UTC).

Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 107.131.148.182

Case Summary

On 09/21/2018 Malibu Media, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 107 131 148 182. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sharon Johnson Coleman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-06429

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sharon Johnson Coleman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Malibu Media, LLC

Defendant

John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 107.131.148.182

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mary K. Schulz

Attorney at Media Litigation Firm, P.C.

1144 E. State Street, Suite A260

Geneva, IL 60134

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Case was called for a status hearing on 11/13/2018. Parties did not appear or contact the court. Status hearing is continued to 12/14/2018 at 9:00 AM. If no one appears at the next status, the case will be dismissed for want of prosecution. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

#11

(#11) STATUS Report by Malibu Media, LLC (Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

#10

(#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Plaintiff's motion for leave to serve a third party subpoena prior to a rule 26(f) conference #7 is granted. No appearance is necessary on 10/4/2018. Status hearing set for 11/13/2018 at 9:00 AM. Plaintiff is directed to advise the defendant of the status hearing forthwith. The parties are reminded that responsive pleadings must comply with section A(3) of this Court's Standing Order Regarding the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 business days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. The Court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. In the event that the defendant files a motion under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b), the defendant is granted leave to notice that motion for presentment at the date and time of the status hearing. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#7

(#7) MOTION by Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLCto serve a third party subpoena prior to a Rule 26(f) conference (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Motion by Mary K. Schulz for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #7 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 10/4/2018 at 08:45 AM. (Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

#8

(#8) MEMORANDUM by Malibu Media, LLC in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #7 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

8 #1

Exhibit A

8 #3

Exhibit C

8 #2

Exhibit B

#6

(#6) MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (mma, ) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (mma, ) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

#4

(#4) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman for all further proceedings. Honorable Joan H. Lefkow no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/21/2018. (mma, ) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLC by Mary K. Schulz (Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Malibu Media, LLC (Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Malibu Media, LLC; jury demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14975265. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Case was called for a status hearing on 11/13/2018. Parties did not appear or contact the court. Status hearing is continued to 12/14/2018 at 9:00 AM. If no one appears at the next status, the case will be dismissed for want of prosecution. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) STATUS Report by Malibu Media, LLC (Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Plaintiff's motion for leave to serve a third party subpoena prior to a rule 26(f) conference #7 is granted. No appearance is necessary on 10/4/2018. Status hearing set for 11/13/2018 at 9:00 AM. Plaintiff is directed to advise the defendant of the status hearing forthwith. The parties are reminded that responsive pleadings must comply with section A(3) of this Court's Standing Order Regarding the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 business days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. The Court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. In the event that the defendant files a motion under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b), the defendant is granted leave to notice that motion for presentment at the date and time of the status hearing. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Motion by Mary K. Schulz for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #7 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 10/4/2018 at 08:45 AM. (Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MEMORANDUM by Malibu Media, LLC in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #7 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION by Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLCto serve a third party subpoena prior to a Rule 26(f) conference (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (mma, ) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (mma, ) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman for all further proceedings. Honorable Joan H. Lefkow no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/21/2018. (mma, ) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Michael T. Mason. (lma, ) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLC by Mary K. Schulz (Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Malibu Media, LLC (Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Malibu Media, LLC; jury demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14975265. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schulz, Mary) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.