This case was last updated from PACER on 10/15/2018 at 07:41:59 (UTC).

Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe

Case Summary

On 08/16/2018 Malibu Media, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Doe. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Liam O'Grady and John F. Anderson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01027

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Liam O'Grady

Referral Judge

John F. Anderson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Malibu Media, LLC

Defendant

John Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Carlin Decker, II

Attorney at Law Office of John C. Decker II

5207 Dalby Lane

Burke, VA 22015

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION for Leave to File Subpoena Prior to Rule 26 Conference filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Decker, John) (Entered: 08/18/2018)

#4

(#4) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jon A. Hoppe and Certification of Local Counsel John C. Decker, II Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6234840. by Malibu Media, LLC. (Decker, John) (Entered: 08/18/2018)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

5 #1

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) ORDER on Motion for Leave to Serve Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference (see Order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 08/21/18. (pmil, ) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Leave to File Subpoena Prior to Rule 26 Conference by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Decker, John) (Entered: 08/18/2018)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Malibu Media, LLC. (Decker, John) (Entered: 08/18/2018)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 08/20/18. (pmil, ) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against John Doe ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6230722.), filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(rban, ) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#7

(#7) Waiver of re #5 MOTION for Leave to File Subpoena Prior to Rule 26 Conference of Oral Argument by Malibu Media, LLC (Decker, John) (Entered: 08/18/2018)

6 #1

Exhibit

2 #1

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit B

6 #2

Exhibit

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER on Motion for Leave to Serve Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference (see Order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 08/21/18. (pmil, ) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 08/20/18. (pmil, ) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Waiver of re #5 MOTION for Leave to File Subpoena Prior to Rule 26 Conference of Oral Argument by Malibu Media, LLC (Decker, John) (Entered: 08/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION for Leave to File Subpoena Prior to Rule 26 Conference filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Decker, John) (Entered: 08/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Leave to File Subpoena Prior to Rule 26 Conference by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Decker, John) (Entered: 08/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jon A. Hoppe and Certification of Local Counsel John C. Decker, II Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6234840. by Malibu Media, LLC. (Decker, John) (Entered: 08/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Malibu Media, LLC. (Decker, John) (Entered: 08/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding copyright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(rban, ) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against John Doe ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6230722.), filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(rban, ) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.