This case was last updated from PACER on 08/19/2018 at 07:04:00 (UTC).

Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe

Case Summary

On 06/20/2018 Malibu Media, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Doe. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alvin W. Thompson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01048

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alvin W. Thompson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Malibu Media, LLC

Defendant

John Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kevin T. Conway

Attorney at Law Office of Kevin T. Conway

664 Chestnut Ridge Road

Spring Valley, NY 10977

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Related Case by Malibu Media, LLC (Conway, Kevin) (Entered: 06/27/2018)

8 #5

Exhibit C - Declaration of Tobias Fieser

8 #3

Exhibit A - Declaration of Colette Pelissier

8 #2

Memorandum in Support

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#8

(#8) MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by Malibu Media, LLC.Responses due by 7/18/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit A - Declaration of Colette Pelissier, #4 Exhibit B - Declaration of Patrick Paige, #5 Exhibit C - Declaration of Tobias Fieser)(Conway, Kevin) (Entered: 06/27/2018)

7 #1

Complaint

#7

(#7) AO 121 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Copyright Form Completed (Attachment: #1 Complaint) (Enderlin, M.) (Entered: 06/20/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Malibu Media, LLC, #5 Protective Order, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Malibu Media, LLC Signed by Clerk on 6/20/2018.(Enderlin, M.) (Entered: 06/20/2018)

#5

(#5) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 6/20/2018.(Enderlin, M.) (Entered: 06/20/2018)

#3

(#3) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 9/20/2018. Amended Pleadings due by 8/19/2018 Discovery due by 12/20/2018 Dispositive Motions due by 1/19/2019 Signed by Clerk on 6/20/2018.(Enderlin, M.) (Entered: 06/20/2018)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Malibu Media, LLC. (Conway, Kevin) (Entered: 06/20/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against John Doe ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-4874052.), filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Conway, Kevin) (Entered: 06/20/2018)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Related Case by Malibu Media, LLC (Conway, Kevin) (Entered: 06/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by Malibu Media, LLC.Responses due by 7/18/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit A - Declaration of Colette Pelissier, #4 Exhibit B - Declaration of Patrick Paige, #5 Exhibit C - Declaration of Tobias Fieser)(Conway, Kevin) (Entered: 06/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AO 121 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Copyright Form Completed (Attachment: #1 Complaint) (Enderlin, M.) (Entered: 06/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Malibu Media, LLC, #5 Protective Order, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Malibu Media, LLC Signed by Clerk on 6/20/2018.(Enderlin, M.) (Entered: 06/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 6/20/2018.(Enderlin, M.) (Entered: 06/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 6/20/2018.(Enderlin, M.) (Entered: 06/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 9/20/2018. Amended Pleadings due by 8/19/2018 Discovery due by 12/20/2018 Dispositive Motions due by 1/19/2019 Signed by Clerk on 6/20/2018.(Enderlin, M.) (Entered: 06/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • Judge Alvin W. Thompson added. (Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 06/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Malibu Media, LLC. (Conway, Kevin) (Entered: 06/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against John Doe ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-4874052.), filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Conway, Kevin) (Entered: 06/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.