This case was last updated from PACER on 08/18/2018 at 07:05:02 (UTC).

Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe

Case Summary

On 06/19/2018 Malibu Media, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Doe. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Vanessa L. Bryant. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01037

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vanessa L. Bryant

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Malibu Media, LLC

Defendant

John Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kevin T. Conway

Attorney at Law Office of Kevin T. Conway

664 Chestnut Ridge Road

Spring Valley, NY 10977

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Serve Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/30/2018. (Mattessich, William) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Related Case by Malibu Media, LLC (Conway, Kevin) (Entered: 06/27/2018)

9 #5

Exhibit C - Declaration of Tobias Fieser

9 #4

Exhibit B - Declaration of Patrick Paige

9 #3

Exhibit A - Declaration of Colette Pelissier

9 #2

Memorandum in Support

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#9

(#9) MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by Malibu Media, LLC.Responses due by 7/18/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit A - Declaration of Colette Pelissier, #4 Exhibit B - Declaration of Patrick Paige, #5 Exhibit C - Declaration of Tobias Fieser)(Conway, Kevin) (Entered: 06/27/2018)

8 #1

Complaint Attachment

#8

(#8) AO 121 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Copyright Form Completed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Attachment) (Hernandez, T.) (Entered: 06/19/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Malibu Media, LLC, #6 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Malibu Media, LLC Signed by Clerk on 06/19/2018.(Hernandez, T.) (Entered: 06/19/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 06/19/2018.(Hernandez, T.) (Entered: 06/19/2018)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 06/19/2018.(Hernandez, T.) (Entered: 06/19/2018)

#3

(#3) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 9/19/2018. Amended Pleadings due by 8/18/2018. Discovery due by 12/19/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 1/18/2019. Signed by Clerk on 06/19/2018.(Hernandez, T.) (Entered: 06/19/2018)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against John Doe ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-4872232.), filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Conway, Kevin) (Entered: 06/19/2018)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Serve Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/30/2018. (Mattessich, William) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Related Case by Malibu Media, LLC (Conway, Kevin) (Entered: 06/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by Malibu Media, LLC.Responses due by 7/18/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit A - Declaration of Colette Pelissier, #4 Exhibit B - Declaration of Patrick Paige, #5 Exhibit C - Declaration of Tobias Fieser)(Conway, Kevin) (Entered: 06/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AO 121 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Copyright Form Completed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Attachment) (Hernandez, T.) (Entered: 06/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Malibu Media, LLC, #6 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Malibu Media, LLC Signed by Clerk on 06/19/2018.(Hernandez, T.) (Entered: 06/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 06/19/2018.(Hernandez, T.) (Entered: 06/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 06/19/2018.(Hernandez, T.) (Entered: 06/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 06/19/2018.(Hernandez, T.) (Entered: 06/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 9/19/2018. Amended Pleadings due by 8/18/2018. Discovery due by 12/19/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 1/18/2019. Signed by Clerk on 06/19/2018.(Hernandez, T.) (Entered: 06/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 06/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Malibu Media, LLC. (Conway, Kevin) (Entered: 06/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against John Doe ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-4872232.), filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Conway, Kevin) (Entered: 06/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less