This case was last updated from PACER on 07/31/2018 at 07:04:02 (UTC).

Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe

Case Summary

On 06/01/2018 Malibu Media, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Doe. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ivan D. Davis and Anthony J Trenga. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00660

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ivan D. Davis

Presiding Judge

Anthony J Trenga

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Malibu Media, LLC

Defendant

John Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Carlin Decker, II

Attorney at Law Office of John C. Decker II

5207 Dalby Lane

Burke, VA 22015

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 6/8/18. (klau, ) (Entered: 06/08/2018)

#7

(#7) Waiver of re #5 MOTION for Leave to File Subpoena Prior to Rule 26 Conference of Oral Argument by Malibu Media, LLC (Decker, John) (Entered: 06/06/2018)

6 #3

Exhibit

6 #2

Exhibit

6 #1

Exhibit

#6

(#6) Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION for Leave to File Subpoena Prior to Rule 26 Conference filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Decker, John) (Entered: 06/06/2018)

5 #1

Proposed Order

#5

(#5) MOTION for Leave to File Subpoena Prior to Rule 26 Conference by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Decker, John) (Entered: 06/06/2018)

#4

(#4) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jon A. Hoppe, Esquire and Certification of Local Counsel John C. Decker, II, Esquire Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6119415. by Malibu Media, LLC. (Decker, John) (Entered: 06/06/2018)

#3

(#3) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Malibu Media, LLC. (Decker, John) (Entered: 06/06/2018)

#2

(#2) Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding copyright 71.241.255.165. (c/s) (dest, ) (Entered: 06/06/2018)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against John Doe ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6111996.), filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(dest, ) (Entered: 06/06/2018)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 6/8/18. (klau, ) (Entered: 06/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to File Subpoena Prior to Rule 26 Conference (see order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 6/7/18. (klau, ) (Entered: 06/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Waiver of re #5 MOTION for Leave to File Subpoena Prior to Rule 26 Conference of Oral Argument by Malibu Media, LLC (Decker, John) (Entered: 06/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION for Leave to File Subpoena Prior to Rule 26 Conference filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Decker, John) (Entered: 06/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Leave to File Subpoena Prior to Rule 26 Conference by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Decker, John) (Entered: 06/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jon A. Hoppe, Esquire and Certification of Local Counsel John C. Decker, II, Esquire Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6119415. by Malibu Media, LLC. (Decker, John) (Entered: 06/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Malibu Media, LLC. (Decker, John) (Entered: 06/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding copyright 71.241.255.165. (c/s) (dest, ) (Entered: 06/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against John Doe ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6111996.), filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(dest, ) (Entered: 06/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.