This case was last updated from PACER on 02/05/2019 at 08:10:15 (UTC).

Maier v. Campbell et al

Case Summary

On 12/07/2018 Maier filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Campbell. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas S. Kleeh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00217

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas S. Kleeh

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sharon Maier

Defendants

Bradley Scott Campbell

Nationwide Insurance Company of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kevin T. Tipton

Attorney at Tipton Law Offices

316 Merchant Street, Suite 100

Fairmont, WV 26554

Defendant Attorney

Denise D. Pentino

Attorney at Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP

2100 Market St

Wheeling, WV 26003

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationwide Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Nationwide Insurance Company of America.. (Pentino, Denise) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

#5

(#5) FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 3/19/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/9/2019. Discovery due by 4/30/2019. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 1/17/19. (cnd) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

4 #1

Exhibit

#3

(#3) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Nationwide Insurance Company of America. (Pentino, Denise) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

2 #2

Cover Sheet, Notice and Notice of Removal

2 #1

Summons

#2

(#2) CERTIFIED STATE COURT RECORD from Marion County Circuit Court. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet, Notice and Notice of Removal) (cnd) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Exhibit 8 - Memo re Medical Bills

1 #6

Exhibit 6 - Nationwide Policy Declarations

1 #5

Exhibit 5 Marion County Docket

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - Summons Return on Bradley Scott Campbell

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - WVSOS

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Notice of Electronic Filings

1 #1

Exhibit - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Marion County, (case number 18-C-178) filed by Nationwide Insurance Company of America. Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424-2718669 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Electronic Filings, #3 Exhibit 3 - WVSOS, #4 Exhibit 4 - Summons Return on Bradley Scott Campbell, #5 Exhibit 5 Marion County Docket, #6 Exhibit 6 - Nationwide Policy Declarations, #7 Exhibit 7 - State of Ohio Certificate, #8 Exhibit 8 - Memo re Medical Bills, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(jss) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationwide Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Nationwide Insurance Company of America.. (Pentino, Denise) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 3/19/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/9/2019. Discovery due by 4/30/2019. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 1/17/19. (cnd) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MEMORANDUM of Law in Support by Nationwide Insurance Company of America re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Pentino, Denise) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Nationwide Insurance Company of America. (Pentino, Denise) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFIED STATE COURT RECORD from Marion County Circuit Court. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet, Notice and Notice of Removal) (cnd) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Marion County, (case number 18-C-178) filed by Nationwide Insurance Company of America. Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424-2718669 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Electronic Filings, #3 Exhibit 3 - WVSOS, #4 Exhibit 4 - Summons Return on Bradley Scott Campbell, #5 Exhibit 5 Marion County Docket, #6 Exhibit 6 - Nationwide Policy Declarations, #7 Exhibit 7 - State of Ohio Certificate, #8 Exhibit 8 - Memo re Medical Bills, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(jss) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.