This case was last updated from PACER on 12/11/2018 at 07:40:23 (UTC).

Magee v. Fifth Third Bank

Case Summary

On 10/12/2018 Magee filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Fifth Third Bank. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy S. Black. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00722

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy S. Black

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LENOX MAGEE

Cleveland, OH 44114

Defendant

Fifth Third Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Katherine Aizpuru

1828 L St. Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20036

Hassan A Zavareei

Attorney at Tycko & Zavareei LLP

1828 L Street Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20036

Stuart E Scott

Attorney at Spangenbert, Shibley & Liber, LLP

1001 Lakeside Avenue East, Suite 1700

Cleveland, OH 44114-3400

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6683140) of Andrea Gold by Plaintiff Lenox Magee. (Scott, Stuart) Modified movant name on 11/19/2018 (sct). (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#11

(#11) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 11/15/18. Case No. 1:18-cv-00464-TSB-SKB and 1:18-cv-00722-TSB are CONSOLIDATED for all purposes under LOWER DOCKET NUMBER, 1:18CV464; and ALL FUTURE FILINGS shall be made in Consolidated Case No. 1:18cv464.. (eh) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

#10

(#10) [FILED IN ERROR] ORDER by Judge Susan J. Dlott REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman (vp) Modified docket text on 11/1/2018 (sct). (Entered: 11/01/2018)

#9

(#9) Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Plaintiff Lenox Magee. (Scott, Stuart) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

#8

(#8) RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 1:18-cv-464 ARE related. Case reassigned to Judge Timothy S. Black for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott and Judge Timothy S. Black on 10/29/2018. (jlw) Modified on 10/29/2018 (jlw). (Entered: 10/29/2018)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #5 #6 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Katherine Aizpuru and Hassan Zavareei. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott (wam) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6651997) of Hassan Zavareei by Plaintiff Lenox Magee. (Scott, Stuart) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6651970) of Katherine Aizpuru by Plaintiff Lenox Magee. (Scott, Stuart) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by Plaintiff Lenox Magee re #1 Complaint Signature page (Scott, Stuart) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of filing civil cover sheet re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Lenox Magee (Scott, Stuart) Modified to clarify docket text on 10/15/2018 (jlw). (Entered: 10/15/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Fifth Third Bank, filed by LENOX MAGEE. Recpt number 0648-6636888.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Scott, Stuart) Modified on 10/15/2018 (jlw). (Entered: 10/15/2018)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Correction re: #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Stuart E. Scott. THIS CASE WAS CONSOLIDATED WITH LEAD CASE 1:18-cv-00464 ON 11/15/2018 AND TERMINATED ON THE COURT'S DOCKET. THEREFORE, ALL FURTHER FILINGS SHOULD BE MADE ONLY IN THE LEAD CASE 1:18-CV-00464. THE PRO HAC VICE MOTION IS TERMINATED IN THIS MATTER AND SHOULD BE REFILED BY COUNSEL IN THE LEAD CASE. (km) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6683140) of Andrea Gold by Plaintiff Lenox Magee. (Scott, Stuart) Modified movant name on 11/19/2018 (sct). (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 11/15/18. Case No. 1:18-cv-00464-TSB-SKB and 1:18-cv-00722-TSB are CONSOLIDATED for all purposes under LOWER DOCKET NUMBER, 1:18CV464; and ALL FUTURE FILINGS shall be made in Consolidated Case No. 1:18cv464.. (eh) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Correction re #10 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge: Filed in error in the case. (sct) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) [FILED IN ERROR] ORDER by Judge Susan J. Dlott REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman (vp) Modified docket text on 11/1/2018 (sct). (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Plaintiff Lenox Magee. (Scott, Stuart) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 1:18-cv-464 ARE related. Case reassigned to Judge Timothy S. Black for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott and Judge Timothy S. Black on 10/29/2018. (jlw) Modified on 10/29/2018 (jlw). (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting #5 #6 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Katherine Aizpuru and Hassan Zavareei. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott (wam) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6651997) of Hassan Zavareei by Plaintiff Lenox Magee. (Scott, Stuart) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6651970) of Katherine Aizpuru by Plaintiff Lenox Magee. (Scott, Stuart) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE by Plaintiff Lenox Magee re #1 Complaint Signature page (Scott, Stuart) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of filing civil cover sheet re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Lenox Magee (Scott, Stuart) Modified to clarify docket text on 10/15/2018 (jlw). (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (jlw) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Fifth Third Bank, filed by LENOX MAGEE. Recpt number 0648-6636888.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Scott, Stuart) Modified on 10/15/2018 (jlw). (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less