This case was last updated from PACER on 11/03/2018 at 07:36:38 (UTC).

Maehr v. Internal Revenue Service, et al.

Case Summary

On 09/04/2018 Maehr filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against Internal Revenue Service. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gordon P. Gallagher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-02273

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gordon P. Gallagher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jeffrey T. Maehr

Pagosa Springs, CO 81147

Defendants

IRS

Internal Revenue Service

U.S. Congress

U.S. State Department

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Internal Revenue Service, U.S. State Department, U.S. Congress, filed by Jeffrey T. Maehr.(agarc, ) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

#7

(#7) MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion for Enlargement of Time (ECF No. #6 ) filed September 19, 2018, is GRANTED as follows: Plaintiff shall have up to and including October 30, 2018, to file an amended complaint. Plaintiff is reminded that the action will be dismissed without further notice if he fails to file an amended complaint as directed, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/21/2018. (angar, ) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to file an Amended Complaint, by Plaintiff Jeffrey T. Maehr. (evana, ) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#5

(#5) ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint. If Mr. Maehr fails within the time allowed to file an amended complaint that complies with this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/7/2018. (angar, ) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#4

(#4) ORDER Granting Plaintiff #3 Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/5/2018. (angar, ) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

#3

(#3) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Jeffrey T. Maehr. (dbera, ) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

1 #2

Envelope

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against IRS, filed by Jeffrey T. Maehr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(dbera, ) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Internal Revenue Service, U.S. State Department, U.S. Congress, filed by Jeffrey T. Maehr.(agarc, ) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion for Enlargement of Time (ECF No. #6 ) filed September 19, 2018, is GRANTED as follows: Plaintiff shall have up to and including October 30, 2018, to file an amended complaint. Plaintiff is reminded that the action will be dismissed without further notice if he fails to file an amended complaint as directed, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/21/2018. (angar, ) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to file an Amended Complaint, by Plaintiff Jeffrey T. Maehr. (evana, ) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint. If Mr. Maehr fails within the time allowed to file an amended complaint that complies with this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/7/2018. (angar, ) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER Granting Plaintiff #3 Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/5/2018. (angar, ) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Jeffrey T. Maehr. (dbera, ) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • (#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (dbera, ) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against IRS, filed by Jeffrey T. Maehr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(dbera, ) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.