This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/22/2019 at 07:10:23 (UTC).

Maeda et al. v. Pinnacle Foods Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/23/2018 Maeda filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Pinnacle Foods Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are RICHARD L. PUGLISI and JILL A. OTAKE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00459

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Referral Judge

RICHARD L. PUGLISI

Presiding Judge

JILL A. OTAKE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Michael Maeda

Iliana Sanchez

Defendants

Pinnacle Foods Inc.

Does 1 through 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Aubry Wand

Attorney at The Wand Law Firm, P.C.

400 Corporate Pointe, Suite 300

Culver City, CA 90230

Brandee J. Faria

Attorney at Perkin & Faria

841 Bishop Street, Suite 1000, 523-2300, Fax: 6975304

Honolulu, HI 96813

Defendant Attorneys

David J. Minkin

Attorney at McCorriston Miller Mukai MacKinnon

Five Waterfront Plaza 4Th Floor, 500 Ala Moana Blvd, 529-7300

Honolulu, HI 96813

Andrew G. Phillips

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP

1201 West Peachtree Street Suite 4900

Atlanta, GA 30309

Jesse J.T. Smith

Attorney at McCorriston Miller Mukai MacKinnon LLP

Po Box 2800, 529-7416

Honolulu, HI 96803

Angela M. Spivey

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP

1201 West Peachtree Street Suite 4900

Atlanta, GA 30309

 

Court Documents

#21

#20

19 #3

Certificate of Service

19 #2

Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Leave to Exceed Pa

19 #1

Declaration of Brandee J.K Faria

#19

#17

#16

#6

#5

#3

#2

1 #4

Certificate of Service

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse J.T. Smith on behalf of Pinnacle Foods Inc. on behalf of Pinnacle Foods Inc.. (Smith, Jesse) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATIONS FOR MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 12/20/2018. (jo) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Brandee J. Faria appearing for Plaintiffs Michael Maeda, Iliana Sanchez (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brandee J.K Faria, #2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitations for Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss, #3 Certificate of Service)(Faria, Brandee) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY ENTRY- (1) Please be advised document #18 (the main document) contains the entire filed document the party has filed, including attachments 1-3, that were already contained in the main document. The filing party may refer to Local Rule 100.2.5 for guidance with respect to submitting Exhibits or PDF-Attachments in a multi-part document. No further action necessary. (2) Viewing access to document #18 is restricted to the filing party and the Court (filing events from the Ex Parte Filings category will restrict viewing of the entry to the Court and the filing party). The Certificate of Service reflects that service was made electronically, through CM/ECF. The filing party may refile the entry as a public document by selecting a filing event from the motions category. Alternatively, an amended certificate of service may be filed. (3) If the filing party has not already done so, Document No. [18-2] (Proposed Order) shall be submitted for consideration to the applicable judge. The filing party may refer to LR100.8.1 Proposed Orders, LR100.8.2 Emailing of Proposed Orders and Stipulations and LR100.8.3 Email addresses for Order and Stipulation submission to chambers. (jo) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) EX PARTE Motion For Leave to Exceed Page Limitations for Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss Brandee J. Faria appearing for Plaintiffs Michael Maeda, Iliana Sanchez (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brandee J.K. Faria in support of Ex Parte, #2 Supplement Proposed Order for Ex Parte Motion, #3 Certificate of Service)(Faria, Brandee) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER GRANTING THE APPLICATION OF ANGELA M. SPIVEY TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE re: #16 . Signed by U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 12/14/2018. (afc) ANGELA M. SPIVEY, ESQ. (Law firm: Alston & Bird LLP) added as attorney pro hac vice for defendant PINNACLE FOODS INC. (afc) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice (Angela M. Spivey) Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2130249.David J. Minkin appearing for Defendant Pinnacle Foods Inc. (Minkin, David) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Docket(#15) EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 12/24/2018 is CONTINUED to 4/26/2019 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(agh) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #11 Defendant Pinnacle Foods Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Class Action Complaint:Motion Hearing is set for 4/12/2019 at 9:30 AM in Aha Kanawai before JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE. (shm) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER GRANTING THE APPLICATION OF ANDREW G. PHILLIPS TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE re: #12 . Signed by U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 12/4/2018. (afc) ANDREW G. PHILLIPS, ESQ. (Law firm: Alston & Bird LLP) added as attorney pro hac vice for defendant PINNACLE FOODS INC. (afc) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT PINNACLE FOODS INC.'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATIONS FOR BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 11/30/2018. Defendant Pinnacle Foods Inc. is granted leave to file its brief in support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Class Action Complaint, with an extension of the page limitations set forth in LR 7.5 to allow up to thirty-five (35) pages in the brief. (jo) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages David J. Minkin appearing for Defendant Pinnacle Foods Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David J. Minkin, #2 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Pinnacle Foods Inc.'s Ex Parte Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitations for Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Certificate of Service)(Minkin, David) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS; Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate - received from Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii. Transmission of those documents filed in the State Court Civil case 18-1-1640-10 BIA: (Attachments: #1 Computerized Index, #2 Civil Information Sheet, #3 Complaint; Exhibits 1-2; Jury Demand; Summons, #4 Exhibit 1 (Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal); #5 Exhibit A to Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit B to Exhibit 1, #7 Exhibit C to Exhibit 1) (afc) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Non E-Filing Participant: Pursuant to LR 100.2.1 the effective date for Mandatory electronic filing was on January 1, 2014. Attached herein is a memorandum in regard to Case Management/Electronic Case Files ("CM/ECF"). Further information may be found at the court's website address www.hid.uscourts.gov including computer based training and a registration form for CM/ECF. (afc) (Entered: 11/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CLERK OF COURT'S MEMORANDUM re: Corporate Disclosure Statements. (afc) (Entered: 11/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 12/24/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 11/24/2018. (afc) (Entered: 11/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2018
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Case Assignment to U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE and U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00459-JAO-RLP on all further pleadings. (afc) (Entered: 11/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pinnacle Foods Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Conagra Brands, Inc. for Pinnacle Foods Inc... (Minkin, David) (Entered: 11/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet by Pinnacle Foods Inc.. (Minkin, David) (Entered: 11/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Pinnacle Foods Inc. from Circuit Court of the First Circuit, case number Civil No. 18-1-1640-10. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2121243), filed by Pinnacle Foods Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate of Service)(Minkin, David) (Entered: 11/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pinnacle Foods is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRANDEE J. FARIA