This case was last updated from PACER on 10/27/2018 at 07:33:31 (UTC).

Mack v. Department of Veteran's Affairs et al

Case Summary

On 08/28/2018 Mack filed a Property - Land lawsuit against Department of Veteran's Affairs. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are G. R. Smith, Lisa G. Wood, James E. Graham and R. Stan Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-00204

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Land

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judges

G. R. Smith

James E. Graham

Presiding Judges

Lisa G. Wood

R. Stan Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kristin-Elizabeth Mack

Savannah, GA 31401

Defendants

Tammy Kennedy

Department of Veteran's Affairs

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER directing the Plaintiff to pay her filing fee or move to proceed IFP within 14 days of the date this order is served. ( Compliance due by 10/15/2018.) Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 9/28/18. (jrb) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

#4

(#4) RESPONSE to #2 Notice of filing fee deficiency filed by Kristin-Elizabeth Mack. (jrb) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#3

(#3) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge R. Stan Baker for all further proceedings. Judge Lisa G. Wood no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 9/4/18. (jrb) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

1 #1

Corrected image

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Filing Fee Deficiency re #1 Complaint. (jrb) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT (Notice of Tort Claim) against Department of Veteran's Affairs and Tammy Kennedy, filed by Kristin-Elizabeth Mack.(jrb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/29/2018: #1 Corrected image) (jrb). (Entered: 08/28/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2018
  • Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge James E. Graham. Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith no longer assigned to the case. (wwp) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER directing the Plaintiff to pay her filing fee or move to proceed IFP within 14 days of the date this order is served. ( Compliance due by 10/15/2018.) Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 9/28/18. (jrb) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RESPONSE to #2 Notice of filing fee deficiency filed by Kristin-Elizabeth Mack. (jrb) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge R. Stan Baker for all further proceedings. Judge Lisa G. Wood no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 9/4/18. (jrb) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 9/18/2018. (jrb) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Filing Fee Deficiency re #1 Complaint. (jrb) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT (Notice of Tort Claim) against Department of Veteran's Affairs and Tammy Kennedy, filed by Kristin-Elizabeth Mack.(jrb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/29/2018: #1 Corrected image) (jrb). (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less