This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2020 at 12:45:01 (UTC).

Machowicz v. BBVA Compass

Case Summary

On 07/06/2017 Machowicz filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against BBVA Compass. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Madeline Hughes Haikala. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:17-CV-01138

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Madeline Hughes Haikala

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael A Machowicz

Defendants

BBVA Compass

Compass Bank

Compass Bank doing business as BBVA Compass

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kevin W Jent

Attorney at WIGGINS CHILDS PANTAZIS FISHER & GOLDFARB

301 19Th Street North

Birmingham, AL 35203-3204

Defendant Attorneys

Douglas B Kauffman

Attorney at BALCH & BINGHAM LLP

1901 Sixth Avenue North, P O Box 306

Birmingham, AL 35203

Christina M Rossi

Attorney at BALCH & BINGHAM LLP

1901 Sixth Avenue North, Suite 1500

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE after having received the parties' #15 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice. The parties are to bear their own fees, costs, and expenses. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 10/22/2018. (JLC) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

#15

(#15) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice filed Jointly by Compass Bank. filed by Compass Bank (Kauffman, Douglas) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

#13

(#13) PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 10/18/2017. (YMB) (Entered: 10/18/2017)

#12

(#12) QUALIFIED HIPAA PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 8/18/2017. (KEK) (Entered: 08/18/2017)

#11

(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/29/2018; Status Conference set for 7/9/2018 11:00 AM in chambers of the undersigned; Dispositive Motions due by 7/31/2018. This case shall be trial ready in December, 2018. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 8/18/2017. (KEK) (Entered: 08/18/2017)

#10

(#10) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Kauffman, Douglas) (Entered: 08/18/2017)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Amend/Correct Defendant's Name (Unopposed) by Michael A Machowicz. (Jent, Kevin) (Entered: 07/19/2017)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BBVA Compass. filed by BBVA Compass (Kauffman, Douglas) (Entered: 07/19/2017)

#6

(#6) Compass Bank d/b/a BBVA Compass' ANSWER to #1 Complaint by BBVA Compass.(Kauffman, Douglas) (Entered: 07/19/2017)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael A Machowicz. BBVA Compass served (no date on green card). (KEK) (Entered: 07/12/2017)

#4

(#4) INITIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 7/10/2017. (KEK) (Entered: 07/10/2017)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to BBVA Compass. Sent via certified mail. (KEK) (Entered: 07/06/2017)

#2

(#2) Request for service by certified mail filed by Michael A Machowicz. (KEK) (Entered: 07/06/2017)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against BBVA Compass (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ALND B4601081437), filed by Michael A Machowicz.(KEK) (Entered: 07/06/2017)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE after having received the parties' #15 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice. The parties are to bear their own fees, costs, and expenses. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 10/22/2018. (JLC) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice filed Jointly by Compass Bank. filed by Compass Bank (Kauffman, Douglas) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • (#14) TEXT ORDER: Consistent with the discussion held during the status conference on July 9, 2018, the Court extends the dispositive motions deadline to October 15, 2018. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 7/9/2018. (YMB) (Entered: 07/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala: Status Conference held on 7/9/2018. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Julie Martin.) (YMB) (Entered: 07/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 10/18/2017. (YMB) (Entered: 10/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) QUALIFIED HIPAA PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 8/18/2017. (KEK) (Entered: 08/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/29/2018; Status Conference set for 7/9/2018 11:00 AM in chambers of the undersigned; Dispositive Motions due by 7/31/2018. This case shall be trial ready in December, 2018. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 8/18/2017. (KEK) (Entered: 08/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Kauffman, Douglas) (Entered: 08/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) TEXT ORDER: The Court GRANTS defendant's unopposed Motion to Correctly Name Party Defendant. (Doc. #8 ). The Court asks the Clerk to please amend the docket to reflect the defendant's name as Compass Bank d/b/a BBVA Compass. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 7/25/2017. (YMB) (Entered: 07/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/21/2017. (YMB) (Entered: 07/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Amend/Correct Defendant's Name (Unopposed) by Michael A Machowicz. (Jent, Kevin) (Entered: 07/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BBVA Compass. filed by BBVA Compass (Kauffman, Douglas) (Entered: 07/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Compass Bank d/b/a BBVA Compass' ANSWER to #1 Complaint by BBVA Compass.(Kauffman, Douglas) (Entered: 07/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael A Machowicz. BBVA Compass served (no date on green card). (KEK) (Entered: 07/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) INITIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 7/10/2017. (KEK) (Entered: 07/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to BBVA Compass. Sent via certified mail. (KEK) (Entered: 07/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Request for service by certified mail filed by Michael A Machowicz. (KEK) (Entered: 07/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against BBVA Compass (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ALND B4601081437), filed by Michael A Machowicz.(KEK) (Entered: 07/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less