This case was last updated from PACER on 09/21/2018 at 07:37:22 (UTC).

Mabray v. Hartford Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/23/2018 Mabray filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Hartford Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Steven P. Shreder and Ronald A. White. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-00229

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Steven P. Shreder

Ronald A. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nick Mabray

Defendant

Hartford Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph R. Farris

Attorney at Franden Farris Quillin Goodnight & Roberts

Two W Second St, Ste 900

Tulsa, OK 74103-4509

Alexandria G. Mayfield

Attorney at Franden Farris Quillin Goodnight & Roberts

Two W Second St, Ste 900

Tulsa, OK 74103-4509

Defendant Attorneys

Jodi W. Dishman

Attorney at McAfee & Taft (OKC)

211 N Robinson, 10Th Flr

Oklahoma City, OK 73102-7103

Jessica L. Dickerson

Attorney at McAfee & Taft (Tulsa)

Two W Second St, Ste 1100

Tulsa, OK 74103

 

Court Documents

4 #1

Consent or Reassignment Form

#4

(#4) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder setting Scheduling Conference for 8/17/2018 at 11:15 a.m. in Chambers, Room 425, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. Parties directed to file Joint Status Report by 8/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent or Reassignment Form) (ndd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

#3

(#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Consent forms provided to filing party (Filing Fee due by 7/30/2018) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

2 #6

Exhibit 6 - Service of Process Transmittal

2 #5

Exhibit 5 - Summons

2 #4

Exhibit 4 - Entry of Appearance

2 #3

Exhibit 3 - Docket Sheet

2 #2

Exhibit 2 - First Amended Petition

2 #1

Exhibit 1 - Petition

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Removal from Cherokee County District Court, case number 17-CJ-153 by Hartford Insurance Company (With attachments)(pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Hartford Insurance Company (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder setting Scheduling Conference for 8/17/2018 at 11:15 a.m. in Chambers, Room 425, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. Parties directed to file Joint Status Report by 8/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent or Reassignment Form) (ndd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • FILING FEES Paid in Full on 7/23/2018 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1193748 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by Hartford Insurance Company (Dishman, Jodi) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Consent forms provided to filing party (Filing Fee due by 7/30/2018) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Removal from Cherokee County District Court, case number 17-CJ-153 by Hartford Insurance Company (With attachments)(pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Hartford Insurance Company (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • FIRST AMENDED PETITION with Jury Demand filed in State Court against Hartford Insurance Company by Nick Mabray (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less