This case was last updated from PACER on 01/04/2019 at 07:38:06 (UTC).

Lynn v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 11/05/2018 Lynn filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sheryl H. Lipman and Diane K. Vescovo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02769

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sheryl H. Lipman

Referral Judge

Diane K. Vescovo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eddie Lynn

Defendant

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Louis P. Chiozza, Jr.

Attorney at CHIOZZA & ASSOCIATES

230 Adams Ave.

Memphis, TN 38103

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eddie Lynn. United States of America served on 11/29/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. U.S. Attorney General served on 11/07/2018. U.S. Attorney served on 11/29/2018. (Chiozza, Louis) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

#8

(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Certifcate of Good Faith, Notice of Filing Proof of Service, Affidavit of Compliance with Exhibits and Summons served on Honorable Jeff Sessions, as Attorney General on 11/07/2018, filed by Eddie Lynn. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service on VA General Counsel)(Chiozza, Louis) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

8 #1

Affidavit of Service on VA General Counsel

7 #2

US Attorney

7 #1

General Counsel

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 General Counsel, #2 US Attorney)(jae) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

#3

(#3) Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jae) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

2 #1

Summons to VA General Counsel

2 #2

Summons to U.S. Attorney for Western District of TN

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Summons by Louis P. Chiozza, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons to VA General Counsel, #2 Summons to U.S. Attorney for Western District of TN)(Chiozza, Louis) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

1 #8

Exhibit 60 day NOI letter to U.S. Atty Memphis

1 #9

Exhibit 60 day NOI letter to Memphis VAMC

1 #6

Exhibit 60 day NOI letter to U.S. Atty General Jeff Sessions

1 #7

Exhibit 60 day NOI letter to VA General Counsel in D.C.

1 #4

Exhibit Notice of Compliance

1 #5

Exhibit 60 day NOI letter to VA General Counsel Nashville

1 #2

Affidavit Affidavit of Compliance

1 #3

Exhibit Certificate of Good Faith

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eddie Lynn. United States of America served on 11/29/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. U.S. Attorney General served on 11/07/2018. U.S. Attorney served on 11/29/2018. (Chiozza, Louis) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Certifcate of Good Faith, Notice of Filing Proof of Service, Affidavit of Compliance with Exhibits and Summons served on Honorable Jeff Sessions, as Attorney General on 11/07/2018, filed by Eddie Lynn. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service on VA General Counsel)(Chiozza, Louis) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 General Counsel, #2 US Attorney)(jae) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • (#6) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • (#5) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • (#4) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jae) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Summons by Louis P. Chiozza, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons to VA General Counsel, #2 Summons to U.S. Attorney for Western District of TN)(Chiozza, Louis) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2917842), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Compliance, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Faith, #4 Exhibit Notice of Compliance, #5 Exhibit 60 day NOI letter to VA General Counsel Nashville, #6 Exhibit 60 day NOI letter to U.S. Atty General Jeff Sessions, #7 Exhibit 60 day NOI letter to VA General Counsel in D.C., #8 Exhibit 60 day NOI letter to U.S. Atty Memphis, #9 Exhibit 60 day NOI letter to Memphis VAMC)(Chiozza, Louis) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.